There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives to support the repatriation of religious and ethnic minorities in Iraq to their ancestral homelands.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/27/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
06/20/2019Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
06/20/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
03/27/2019Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
03/27/2019Introduced in House

Cosponsors (76)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 03/27/2019
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2] 04/08/2019
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/08/2019
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18] 04/08/2019
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 04/08/2019
Rep. Reschenthaler, Guy [R-PA-14] 04/08/2019
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/08/2019
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 04/08/2019
Rep. Fulcher, Russ [R-ID-1] 04/08/2019
Rep. Wright, Ron [R-TX-6] 04/08/2019
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 04/30/2019
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/30/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 04/30/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/30/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 05/03/2019
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 05/03/2019
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8] 05/03/2019
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 05/09/2019
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 05/09/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 05/10/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/10/2019
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 05/10/2019
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 05/15/2019
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 05/15/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/15/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/15/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/24/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 05/24/2019
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 06/12/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 06/12/2019
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 06/12/2019
Rep. Watkins, Steve [R-KS-2] 06/12/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 06/12/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 06/12/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/12/2019
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 06/13/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 06/13/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 06/13/2019
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/13/2019
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 06/13/2019
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/13/2019
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/13/2019
Rep. Guest, Michael [R-MS-3] 06/18/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/18/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 06/18/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 06/18/2019
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 06/18/2019
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 06/18/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 06/18/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 06/18/2019
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 06/18/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/18/2019
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 06/18/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 06/18/2019
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/18/2019
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 06/18/2019
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 06/20/2019
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 06/20/2019
Rep. Allred, Colin Z. [D-TX-32] 06/20/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 06/20/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/20/2019
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 06/20/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 06/20/2019
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 06/20/2019
Rep. Crenshaw, Dan [R-TX-2] 06/25/2019
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 06/25/2019
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-10] 06/25/2019
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 06/25/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/25/2019
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5] 06/25/2019
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4] 06/25/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 07/24/2019
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 07/25/2019
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 09/26/2019
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 09/26/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 11/12/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs03/27/2019 Referred to
06/20/2019 Markup by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.