There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Condemning the Trump Administration's Legal Campaign to Take Away Americans' Health Care.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
04/03/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 240 - 186, 1 Present (Roll no. 146).(text: CR 4/2/2019 H2956-2957)
03/29/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date
04/03/2019-2:23pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/03/2019-2:23pmOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 240 - 186, 1 Present (Roll no. 146). (text: CR 4/2/2019 H2956-2957)
04/03/2019-2:14pmConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3002-3003)
04/02/2019-3:31pmThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
04/02/2019-1:58pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 271.
04/02/2019-1:57pmRule provides for consideration of S.J. Res. 7 and H. Res. 271. Rule provides for the previous question to be considered as ordered without intervening motions for both measures except for one hour of debate; one motion to recommit S.J. Res. 7 is allowed. It shall be in order at any time on the legislative day of April 4, 2019 for the Speaker to entertain motions that the House suspend the rules.
04/02/2019-1:57pmConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 274. (consideration: CR H2956-2969)
04/02/2019-1:54pmRule H. Res. 274 passed House.
04/01/2019-7:27pmRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 274 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of S.J. Res. 7 and H. Res. 271. Rule provides for the previous question to be considered as ordered without intervening motions for both measures except for one hour of debate; one motion to recommit S.J. Res. 7 is allowed. It shall be in order at any time on the legislative day of April 4, 2019 for the Speaker to entertain motions that the House suspend the rules.
03/29/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/29/2019Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/29/2019Introduced in House

Cosponsors (104)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 04/02/2019
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 04/02/2019
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 04/02/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 04/02/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/02/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 04/02/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 04/02/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 04/02/2019
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27] 04/02/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 04/02/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 04/02/2019
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/02/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/02/2019
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 04/02/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 04/02/2019
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/02/2019
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 04/02/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/02/2019
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 04/02/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 04/02/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 04/02/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 04/02/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 04/02/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/02/2019
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 04/02/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 04/02/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 04/02/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 04/02/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/02/2019
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 04/02/2019
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 04/02/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 04/02/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 04/02/2019
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/02/2019
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/02/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/02/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 04/02/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 04/02/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 04/02/2019
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 04/02/2019
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 04/02/2019
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 04/02/2019
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 04/02/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 04/02/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 04/02/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 04/02/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/02/2019
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 04/02/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 04/02/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 04/02/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 04/02/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 04/02/2019
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [D-NJ-2] 04/02/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 04/02/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 04/02/2019
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 04/02/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 04/02/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/02/2019
Rep. Finkenauer, Abby [D-IA-1] 04/02/2019
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/02/2019
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 04/02/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 04/02/2019
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 04/02/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/02/2019
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 04/02/2019
Rep. Sherrill, Mikie [D-NJ-11] 04/02/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 04/02/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 04/02/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 04/02/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/02/2019
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 04/02/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/02/2019
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10] 04/02/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 04/02/2019
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 04/02/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 04/02/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 04/02/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 04/02/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 04/02/2019
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29] 04/02/2019
Rep. Fletcher, Lizzie [D-TX-7] 04/02/2019
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2] 04/02/2019
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 04/02/2019
Rep. Stanton, Greg [D-AZ-9] 04/02/2019
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 04/02/2019
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 04/02/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 04/02/2019
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 04/02/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 04/02/2019
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 04/02/2019
Rep. Schrier, Kim [D-WA-8] 04/02/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 04/02/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 04/02/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 04/02/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 04/02/2019
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 04/02/2019
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/02/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 04/02/2019
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/02/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 04/02/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 04/02/2019
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 04/02/2019
Rep. Horn, Kendra S. [D-OK-5] 04/02/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 04/02/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce03/29/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary03/29/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.271. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (04/03/2019)

This resolution urges the Department of Justice (DOJ) to cease its efforts against the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (PPACA) and reverse its position in Texas v. United States. (On March 25, 2019, DOJ submitted a letter to the appellate court agreeing with the lower court's decision that PPACA should be struck in its entirety).