Summary: H.Res.389 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed House (05/21/2019)

This resolution sets forth the rule for consideration of H.R. 1500 ( Consumers First Act) and H.R. 1994 (Setting Every Community Up for Retirement Enhancement Act of 2019).

Certain proceedings may take place on any legislative day from May 24, 2019, through May 31, 2019.

It shall be in order at any time on the legislative day of May 23, 2019, for the Speaker of the House to suspend the rules, relating to a measure making supplemental appropriations for FY2019.

The resolution waives a specified requirement of Rule XIII (Calendar and Committee Reports) to allow consideration of any resolution reported from the Committee on Rules through such legislative day, on the same day it is presented to the House, relating to such measure.

The House Committee on Appropriations may, at any time before 5:00 p.m. on Sunday, June 2, 2019, file privileged reports to accompany measures making appropriations for FY2020.