There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing support for the designation of March 2, 2019, as "Gold Star Families Remembrance Day".


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/11/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
01/24/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
01/16/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
01/11/2019Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
01/11/2019Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
01/11/2019Introduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services01/11/2019 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel01/24/2019 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs01/11/2019 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs01/16/2019 Referred to

As of 05/19/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.Res.39 - Expressing support for the designation of March 2, 2019, as "Gold Star Families Remembrance Day"..


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.39. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/11/2019)

This resolution supports the designation of Gold Star Families Remembrance Day.