Text: H.Res.41 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Engrossed in House (01/15/2019)

 
[Congressional Bills 116th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]
[H. Res. 41 Engrossed in House (EH)]

<DOC>
H. Res. 41

                In the House of Representatives, U. S.,

                                                      January 15, 2019.
Whereas, on January 10, 2019, Representative Steve King was quoted as asking, 
        ``White nationalist, white supremacist, Western civilization--how did 
        that language become offensive?'';
Whereas a 2006 Federal Bureau of Intelligence (FBI) assessment defined a White 
        supremacist as follows: ``White supremacists believe that the white race 
        is superior to all other races and was created to rule them. They view 
        non-whites as subhuman and usually refer to them in derogatory terms'';
Whereas the same 2006 FBI intelligence assessment defined a White nationalist as 
        follows: ``To be a white nationalist is to be pro-white. The domestic 
        white nationalist movement seeks to promote, honor, and defend the white 
        race. They believe the white race is under attack from Jewish interests 
        that dominate the government (referred to as the Zionist Occupied 
        Government, or ZOG), the media, banking, and entertainment industries 
        and act to the detriment of the white race. White nationalists view 
        multiculturalism, diversity, and illegal immigration as direct assaults 
        on the white race and race-mixing as akin to white genocide. They hope 
        to appeal to mainstream whites, believing that the majority of white 
        people do not understand the imminent or long-term threat to their race. 
        Many contend that a race war, often referred to as RAHOWA, or Racial 
        Holy War, is a certainty'';
Whereas White supremacy and White nationalism are contrary to the ideals of the 
        United States of America, which was established according to the 
        principle stated in the Declaration of Independence that all men are 
        created equal, a principle that was updated in 1848 in Seneca Falls, New 
        York, to include all people;
Whereas while our country has often fallen short of these ideals, patriotic 
        Americans have sought to form a more perfect Union by rejecting White 
        nationalism and White supremacy, embracing inclusive patriotism, and 
        welcoming immigrants from across the globe who have continuously 
        enriched our Nation;
Whereas Abraham Lincoln in an 1858 speech said of the Founders, ``Wise statesmen 
        as they were, they knew the tendency of prosperity to breed tyrants, and 
        so they established these great self-evident truths, that when in the 
        distant future some man, some faction, some interest, should set up the 
        doctrine that none but rich men, or none but white men, were entitled to 
        life, liberty, and pursuit of happiness, their posterity might look up 
        again to the Declaration of Independence and take courage to renew the 
        battle which their fathers began--so that truth, and justice, and mercy, 
        and all the humane and Christian virtues might not be extinguished from 
        the land; so that no man would hereafter dare to limit and circumscribe 
        the great principles on which the temple of liberty was being built'';
Whereas Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr., while recognizing that ``no other nation 
        can mean to us what our nation means'', condemned ``nationalism 
        perverted into chauvinism and isolationism'' as ``preached by * * * the 
        advocators of white supremacy'' and asked, ``Will we continue to serve 
        the false god of racial prejudice or will we serve the God who made of 
        one blood all men to dwell upon the face of the earth?'';
Whereas President Reagan observed in a 1988 speech, ``Anyone, from any corner of 
        the Earth, can come to live in America and become an American * * * 
        This, I believe, is one of the most important sources of America's 
        greatness. We lead the world because, unique among nations, we draw our 
        people--our strength--from every country and every corner of the world. 
        And by doing so we continuously renew and enrich our nation. While other 
        countries cling to the stale past, here in America we breathe life into 
        dreams. We create the future, and the world follows us into tomorrow. 
        Thanks to each wave of new arrivals to this land of opportunity, we're a 
        nation forever young, forever bursting with energy and new ideas, and 
        always on the cutting edge, always leading the world to the next 
        frontier. This quality is vital to our future as a nation. If we ever 
        closed the door to new Americans, our leadership in the world would soon 
        be lost'';
Whereas according to FBI statistics, hate crimes nationwide increased in 2015, 
        2016, and 2017, the three most recent years for which data is available;
Whereas the perpetrator of the shooting that killed 9 African-American 
        worshippers at Emanuel African Methodist Episcopal Church in Charleston, 
        South Carolina, on June 17, 2015, was motivated by White supremacy and 
        White nationalism to carry out this act of terrorism, and stated that he 
        would ``be rescued by white nationalists after they took over the 
        government'';
Whereas the perpetrator of the shooting that killed 11 Jewish worshippers at 
        Tree of Life synagogue in Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, on October 27, 2018, 
        accused Jews of ``waging a propaganda war against Western civilization'' 
        and ``committing genocide'' against Whites by promoting immigration and 
        refugee resettlement, and accused the President of being ``a globalist, 
        not a nationalist'' because of the ``infestation'' of Jews; and
Whereas Public Law 115-58, a joint resolution signed into law on September 14, 
        2017, rejects ``white nationalism, white supremacists, the Ku Klux Klan, 
        neo-Nazis, and other hate groups'': Now, therefore, be it
    Resolved, That the House of Representatives once again rejects White 
nationalism and White supremacy as hateful expressions of intolerance that are 
contradictory to the values that define the people of the United States.
            Attest:

                                                                          Clerk.

Share This