There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the immense gratitude of the House of Representatives for the acts of heroism, valor, and sacrifices made by the members of the United States Armed Forces and allied armed forces who participated in the June 6, 1944, amphibious landing at Normandy, France, and commending those individuals for their leadership and bravery in an operation that helped bring an end to World War II.


Actions Overview (5)

Date
06/04/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection.(text: CR H4295-4296)
06/04/2019Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged.
06/04/2019Committee on Foreign Affairs discharged.
06/04/2019Committee on Armed Services discharged.
05/30/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date
06/10/2019Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E729-730)
06/04/2019-6:54pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/04/2019-6:54pmOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H4295-4296)
06/04/2019-6:53pmConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H4295-4296)
06/04/2019Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged.
06/04/2019Committee on Foreign Affairs discharged.
06/04/2019Committee on Armed Services discharged.
06/04/2019-6:53pmMr. Keating asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
05/31/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
05/30/2019Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/30/2019Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/30/2019Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/30/2019Introduced in House

Cosponsors (37)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/30/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 05/30/2019
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 05/30/2019
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 05/30/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 05/30/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 05/30/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1]* 05/30/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15]* 05/30/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 05/30/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6]* 05/30/2019
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 05/30/2019
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 05/30/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/30/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 05/30/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 05/30/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 05/30/2019
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20]* 05/30/2019
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 05/30/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 05/30/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7]* 05/30/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 05/30/2019
Rep. Wright, Ron [R-TX-6]* 05/30/2019
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8]* 05/30/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 05/30/2019
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8]* 05/30/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 05/30/2019
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36]* 05/30/2019
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 05/30/2019
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2]* 05/30/2019
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 05/30/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 05/30/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 05/30/2019
Rep. Guest, Michael [R-MS-3]* 05/30/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 06/04/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/04/2019
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 06/04/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 06/04/2019

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services05/30/2019 Referred to
06/04/2019 Discharged from
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel05/31/2019 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs05/30/2019 Referred to
06/04/2019 Discharged from
House Veterans' Affairs05/30/2019 Referred to
06/04/2019 Discharged from

As of 01/17/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.Res.413 - Expressing the immense gratitude of the House of Representatives for the acts of heroism, valor, and sacrifices made by the members of the United States Armed Forces and allied armed forces who participated in the June 6, 1944, amphibious landing at Normandy, France, and commending those individuals for their leadership and bravery in an operation that helped bring an end to World War II.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.413. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (06/04/2019)

This resolution recognizes the 75th anniversary of the amphibious landing of the allied forces on D-Day, June 6, 1944, at Normandy, France, during World War II.

The resolution

  • expresses appreciation to the members of the U.S. and allied forces who participated in the operations, as well as all others who contributed to the success of the operations;
  • recognizes the landing as a decisive point in history that led to world leadership and a free people committed to modern liberal democracy and all its tenets;
  • recognizes the importance of World War II history and D-Day as symbols of the costs of freedom, the perils of fascism, and the nature of U.S. global alliances and partnerships;
  • thanks the young people of the allies for their involvement in events celebrating the anniversary of the Normandy landings;
  • calls for expanding educational efforts about the lessons of World War II;
  • recognizes the efforts of France and the people of Normandy to preserve the world heritage represented by the Normandy beaches and the sunken material remains of the landings by inscribing these on the UNESCO World Heritage List;
  • requests the President to issue a proclamation recognizing the living veterans of the campaign; and
  • calls on the people of the United States to observe the 75th anniversary.