There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Supporting Coptic Christians in Egypt.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/16/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
03/14/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Middle East, North Africa and International Terrorism.
01/16/2019Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
01/16/2019Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H607-608)
01/16/2019Introduced in House

Cosponsors (54)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36]* 01/16/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 01/17/2019
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 01/17/2019
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 01/17/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 01/22/2019
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 01/22/2019
Rep. Green, Mark E. [R-TN-7] 01/24/2019
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 01/24/2019
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4] 01/24/2019
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/24/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 01/29/2019
Rep. Curtis, John R. [R-UT-3] 01/29/2019
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8] 01/29/2019
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8] 02/06/2019
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 02/06/2019
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 02/06/2019
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 02/06/2019
Rep. Wright, Ron [R-TX-6] 02/06/2019
Rep. Estes, Ron [R-KS-4] 02/06/2019
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/06/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 02/07/2019
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3] 02/07/2019
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 02/07/2019
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 02/07/2019
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 02/07/2019
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 02/07/2019
Rep. Crenshaw, Dan [R-TX-2] 02/07/2019
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 02/07/2019
Rep. Spano, Ross [R-FL-15] 02/13/2019
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-10] 03/12/2019
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 03/12/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 03/27/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/27/2019
Rep. Gooden, Lance [R-TX-5] 03/27/2019
Rep. Allred, Colin Z. [D-TX-32] 04/04/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 04/04/2019
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 04/29/2019
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 05/09/2019
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/10/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 06/18/2019
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/20/2019
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 07/10/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 07/25/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs01/16/2019 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Middle East, North Africa and International Terrorism03/14/2019 Referred to

As of 08/23/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.Res.49 - Supporting Coptic Christians in Egypt.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.49. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/16/2019)

This resolution acknowledges the importance of the U.S.-Egypt partnership and Egypt's role in the fight against terrorism and violent extremism. It also urges the Egyptian government to enact serious and legitimate reforms to ensure that Coptic Christians have the same rights and opportunities as other Egyptian citizens, and to take steps to end the culture of impunity for attacks on Christians.