There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Condemning the Trump Administration's systematic cruel and inhumane treatment of migrants, particularly children, at the southern border.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/17/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
07/30/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
07/17/2019Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
07/17/2019Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E937)
07/17/2019Introduced in House

Cosponsors (62)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 07/17/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 07/17/2019
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 07/17/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 07/17/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Pressley, Ayanna [D-MA-7]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2]* 07/17/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/22/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 07/22/2019
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 07/24/2019
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 07/25/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 08/16/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 08/16/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary07/17/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship07/30/2019 Referred to

As of 09/18/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.Res.499 - Condemning the Trump Administration's systematic cruel and inhumane treatment of migrants, particularly children, at the southern border.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.