Summary: H.Res.509 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed House (07/24/2019)

This resolution sets forth the rule for consideration of H.R. 397 (Rehabilitation for Multiemployer Pensions Act), H.R. 3239 (Humanitarian Standards for Individuals in Customs and Border Protection Custody Act), and adopts H.Res. 507 (ratifies and affirms current and future House investigations and subpoenas related to the President).

It shall be in order at any time on the legislative day of July 25, 2019, or July 26, 2019, for the Speaker of the House to suspend the rules.

Certain proceedings may take place on any legislative day from July 29, 2019, through September 6, 2019.