There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Calling for the global repeal of blasphemy, heresy, and apostasy laws.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
12/07/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 386 - 3, 1 Present (Roll no. 236).(text: CR H6865)
07/23/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date All Actions
12/07/2020-3:02pmOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 386 - 3, 1 Present (Roll no. 236). (text: CR H6865)
12/07/2020-2:00pmConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6883)
12/07/2020-12:32pmAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/07/2020-12:22pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 512.
12/07/2020-12:21pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6864-6867)
12/07/2020-12:21pmMr. Raskin moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
03/04/2020Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
03/04/2020Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/23/2019Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
07/23/2019Introduced in House

Cosponsors (43)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 07/23/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/10/2019
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 09/10/2019
Rep. Riggleman, Denver [R-VA-5] 09/24/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 09/24/2019
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/26/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 09/26/2019
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 09/26/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 09/26/2019
Rep. Wright, Ron [R-TX-6] 09/26/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/26/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 10/08/2019
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 10/08/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/08/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 10/08/2019
Rep. Allred, Colin Z. [D-TX-32] 10/08/2019
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 10/08/2019
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 10/28/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 10/28/2019
Rep. Burchett, Tim [R-TN-2] 01/27/2020
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5] 01/27/2020
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 01/27/2020
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/03/2020
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 02/03/2020
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 02/03/2020
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/03/2020
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 02/03/2020
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 02/03/2020
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/03/2020
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 02/03/2020
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 02/03/2020
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 02/03/2020
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 02/03/2020
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 02/03/2020
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/03/2020
Rep. Rooney, Francis [R-FL-19] 02/05/2020
Rep. Miller, Carol D. [R-WV-3] 02/06/2020
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 02/25/2020
Rep. Crenshaw, Dan [R-TX-2] 03/03/2020
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 03/04/2020
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 03/04/2020
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 03/04/2020
Rep. Taylor, Van [R-TX-3] 12/07/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Foreign Affairs07/23/2019 Referred to
03/04/2020 Markup by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.512. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (12/07/2020)

This resolution calls on the President and the Department of State to (1) make the repeal of blasphemy, heresy, and apostasy laws a priority in bilateral relationships between the United States and countries that have such laws; (2) designate countries that enforce such laws as countries of particular concern for religious freedom; and (3) oppose efforts by the United Nations to implement an international anti-blasphemy norm. The resolution also calls on the governments of countries that enforce such laws to amend or repeal them and to release anyone imprisoned pursuant to them.