There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Supporting the Global Fund to fight AIDS, tuberculosis (TB), malaria, and its Sixth Replenishment.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/24/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
09/25/2019Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
09/25/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/24/2019Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
07/24/2019Introduced in House

Cosponsors (138)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 07/24/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 08/13/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 08/13/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 08/13/2019
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 08/13/2019
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 08/13/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 08/13/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 08/13/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 08/27/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 08/27/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26] 08/27/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 08/27/2019
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27] 08/27/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 08/27/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 08/27/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 08/27/2019
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 08/27/2019
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 08/27/2019
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 08/27/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 08/27/2019
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/06/2019
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/06/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 09/06/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 09/06/2019
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 09/06/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 09/10/2019
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/10/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 09/10/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 09/10/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 09/10/2019
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 09/10/2019
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 09/10/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 09/10/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 09/10/2019
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/10/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/10/2019
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11] 09/10/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 09/10/2019
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 09/11/2019
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 09/11/2019
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 09/11/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/11/2019
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 09/11/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 09/11/2019
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 09/11/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 09/11/2019
Rep. Torres Small, Xochitl [D-NM-2] 09/11/2019
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 09/16/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 09/16/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 09/16/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 09/16/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 09/17/2019
Rep. Brindisi, Anthony [D-NY-22] 09/17/2019
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/17/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 09/17/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 09/17/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 09/17/2019
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 09/17/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 09/18/2019
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 09/18/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 09/18/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 09/18/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 09/24/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 09/24/2019
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/24/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 09/24/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/24/2019
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 09/24/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 09/24/2019
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/24/2019
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/24/2019
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 09/24/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 09/24/2019
Rep. Allred, Colin Z. [D-TX-32] 09/24/2019
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 09/24/2019
Rep. Watkins, Steve [R-KS-2] 09/24/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 09/24/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 09/24/2019
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 09/24/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 09/24/2019
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 09/25/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 09/25/2019
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8] 09/25/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 09/25/2019
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/25/2019
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/25/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/25/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 09/25/2019
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 09/25/2019
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/25/2019
Rep. Gooden, Lance [R-TX-5] 09/25/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 09/26/2019
Rep. Taylor, Van [R-TX-3] 09/26/2019
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49] 09/26/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/26/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 09/26/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 09/26/2019
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/26/2019
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 09/26/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 09/26/2019
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 09/26/2019
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/26/2019
Rep. McAdams, Ben [D-UT-4] 10/04/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 10/04/2019
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 10/04/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 10/04/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 10/04/2019
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 10/04/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/04/2019
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 10/04/2019
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 10/04/2019
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 10/04/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 10/04/2019
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 10/04/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 10/04/2019
Rep. Golden, Jared F. [D-ME-2] 10/04/2019
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 10/04/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 10/04/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 10/04/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 10/04/2019
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 10/04/2019
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/04/2019
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 10/04/2019
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 10/04/2019
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/04/2019
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 10/08/2019
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 10/08/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 10/08/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 10/08/2019
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/08/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 10/08/2019
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/11/2019
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23] 10/11/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 10/11/2019
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 10/11/2019
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/11/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 10/11/2019
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 10/16/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs07/24/2019 Referred to
09/25/2019 Markup by

As of 10/18/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.Res.517 - Supporting the Global Fund to fight AIDS, tuberculosis (TB), malaria, and its Sixth Replenishment.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.