There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Reaffirming the commitment to media diversity and pledging to work with media entities and diverse stakeholders to develop common ground solutions to eliminate barriers to media diversity.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
09/10/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date All Actions
07/15/2020Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
07/15/2020Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
03/10/2020Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
03/10/2020Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
09/11/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
09/10/2019Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
09/10/2019Introduced in House

Cosponsors (71)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 09/10/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 09/10/2019
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/12/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/24/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 09/24/2019
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 09/24/2019
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 09/24/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce09/10/2019 Referred to
07/15/2020 Markup by
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications and Technology09/11/2019 Referred to
03/10/2020 Markup by
03/10/2020 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.549. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/10/2019)

This resolution reaffirms the House of Representatives' commitment to media diversity and expresses its pledge to eliminate barriers to such diversity.