There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 1423) to amend title 9 of the United States Code with respect to arbitration; waiving a requirement of clause 6(a) of rule XIII with respect to consideration of certain resolutions reported from the Committee on Rules; and providing for consideration of motions to suspend the rules.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/18/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 228 - 196 (Roll no. 534).(text: CR H7761)
09/17/2019The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 116-210, by Mrs. Torres (CA).
09/17/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date
09/18/2019-1:52pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/18/2019-1:52pmOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 228 - 196 (Roll no. 534). (text: CR H7761)
09/18/2019-1:45pmOn ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 228 - 195 (Roll no. 533). (consideration: CR H7766)
09/18/2019-1:16pmConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR: H7766-7767)
09/18/2019-1:09pmPOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.Res. 558, the Chair put the question on ordering the previous question and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mrs. Lesko demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced.
09/18/2019-12:20pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 558.
09/18/2019-12:17pmConsidered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H7761-7765)
09/17/2019Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 41.
09/17/2019-6:55pmThe resolution waives the requirement of clause 6(a) of rule XIII for a two-thirds vote to consider a report from the Committee on Rules on the same day it is presented to the House with respect to any resolution reported through the legislative day of September 20, 2019, relating to a measure making or continuing appropriations for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2020. The resolution provides that it shall be in order at any time on the legislative day of September 19, 2019, or September 20, 2019, for the Speaker to entertain motions that the House suspend the rules.
09/17/2019The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 116-210, by Mrs. Torres (CA).

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Rules09/17/2019 Reported original measure H. Rept. 116-210

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.Res.558. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (09/18/2019)

This resolution sets forth the rule for consideration of H.R. 1423 (Forced Arbitration Injustice Repeal Act).

The resolution waives a specified requirement of Rule XIII (Calendar and Committee Reports) to allow consideration of any resolution reported from the Committee on Rules through the legislative day of September 20, 2019, relating to a measure making or continuing appropriations for FY2020.

It shall be in order at any time on the legislative day of September 19, 2019, or September 20, 2019, for the Speaker of the House to suspend the rules.