There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Recognizing Hispanic Heritage Month and celebrating the heritage and culture of Latinos in the United States and the immense contributions of Latinos to the United States.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/18/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
09/18/2019Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
09/18/2019Introduced in House

Cosponsors (135)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4]* 09/18/2019
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 09/18/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 09/18/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 09/18/2019
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Mucarsel-Powell, Debbie [D-FL-26]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Omar, Ilhan [D-MN-5]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 09/18/2019
Rep. San Nicolas, Michael F. Q. [D-GU-At Large]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Torres Small, Xochitl [D-NM-2]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Houlahan, Chrissy [D-PA-6]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 09/18/2019
Rep. Lee, Susie [D-NV-3] 09/19/2019
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 09/19/2019
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 09/20/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/24/2019
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 09/24/2019
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 10/01/2019
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 10/08/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 11/08/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Reform09/18/2019 Referred to

As of 02/21/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.Res.561 - Recognizing Hispanic Heritage Month and celebrating the heritage and culture of Latinos in the United States and the immense contributions of Latinos to the United States.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.561. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/18/2019)

This resolution recognizes (1) the celebration of Hispanic Heritage Month; and (2) the integral role of Latinos and their manifold heritage in the economy, culture, and identity of the United States.