Summary: H.Res.577 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed House (09/25/2019)

This resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 2203 (Homeland Security Improvement Act), H.R. 3525 (U.S. Border Patrol Medical Screening Standards Act), and H.Res. 576 (demanding certain action to be taken with respect to the whistle-blower complaint received by the Office of the Inspector General of the Intelligence Community on August 12, 2019).

It shall be in order for the Speaker of the House to suspend the rules at any time on the legislative day of September 26, 2019.

Certain proceedings may take place on any legislative day from September 30, 2019, through October 14, 2019.