There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 2203) to increase transparency, accountability, and community engagement within the Department of Homeland Security, provide independent oversight of border security activities, improve training for agents and officers of U.S. Customs and Border Protection and U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 3525) to amend the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to direct the Commissioner of U.S. Customs and Border Protection to establish uniform processes for medical screening of individuals interdicted between ports of entry, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the resolution (H. Res. 576) expressing the sense of the House of Representatives with respect to the whistleblower complaint of August 12, 2019, made to the Inspector General of the Intelligence Community; and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
09/25/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 228 - 191 (Roll no. 543).
09/24/2019The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 116-217, by Ms. Scanlon.
09/24/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date All Actions
09/25/2019-1:50pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/25/2019-1:50pmOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 228 - 191 (Roll no. 543).
09/25/2019-1:39pmH.Amdt.623 On agreeing to the Scanlon amendment (A001) Agreed to by voice vote.
09/25/2019-1:39pmH.Amdt.623 On ordering the previous question on the amendment (A001) Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 227 - 191 (Roll no. 542). (consideration: CR H7919-7920)
09/25/2019-1:05pmH.Amdt.623 Amendment (A001) offered by Ms. Scanlon. (consideration: CR H7919-7920; text: CR H7919)
09/25/2019-12:16pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 577.
09/25/2019-12:11pmConsidered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H7913-7920)
09/24/2019Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 43.
09/24/2019-7:28pmRule provides for consideration of H.R. 2203, H.R. 3525, and H.Res. 576 under closed rules. Rule also provides that it shall be in order at any time on the legislative day of September 26, 2019, for the Speaker to entertain motions that the House suspend the rules; and provides for proceedings during the period from September 30, 2019, through October 14, 2019
09/24/2019The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 116-217, by Ms. Scanlon.

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Rules09/24/2019 Reported original measure H. Rept. 116-217

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.Res.577. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (09/25/2019)

This resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 2203 (Homeland Security Improvement Act), H.R. 3525 (U.S. Border Patrol Medical Screening Standards Act), and H.Res. 576 (demanding certain action to be taken with respect to the whistle-blower complaint received by the Office of the Inspector General of the Intelligence Community on August 12, 2019).

It shall be in order for the Speaker of the House to suspend the rules at any time on the legislative day of September 26, 2019.

Certain proceedings may take place on any legislative day from September 30, 2019, through October 14, 2019.