There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Condemning and censuring Adam Schiff, Representative of California's 28th Congressional District.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
09/27/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
09/27/2019Referred to the House Committee on Ethics.
09/27/2019Introduced in House

Cosponsors (151)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-23] 10/01/2019
Rep. Green, Mark E. [R-TN-7] 10/01/2019
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 10/01/2019
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 10/01/2019
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 10/01/2019
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-10] 10/01/2019
Rep. Steube, W. Gregory [R-FL-17] 10/01/2019
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 10/01/2019
Rep. Reschenthaler, Guy [R-PA-14] 10/01/2019
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 10/01/2019
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 10/01/2019
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 10/01/2019
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 10/01/2019
Rep. Davidson, Warren [R-OH-8] 10/01/2019
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 10/01/2019
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 10/01/2019
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5] 10/01/2019
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 10/01/2019
Rep. Ferguson, A. Drew, IV [R-GA-3] 10/04/2019
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 10/04/2019
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 10/04/2019
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4] 10/04/2019
Rep. Watkins, Steve [R-KS-2] 10/04/2019
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 10/04/2019
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 10/04/2019
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 10/04/2019
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 10/04/2019
Rep. Balderson, Troy [R-OH-12] 10/04/2019
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 10/04/2019
Rep. Wright, Ron [R-TX-6] 10/04/2019
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 10/04/2019
Rep. Gooden, Lance [R-TX-5] 10/04/2019
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 10/04/2019
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3] 10/04/2019
Rep. Meuser, Daniel [R-PA-9] 10/04/2019
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 10/04/2019
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 10/04/2019
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 10/04/2019
Rep. Burchett, Tim [R-TN-2] 10/04/2019
Rep. Bishop, Dan [R-NC-9] 10/04/2019
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-11] 10/04/2019
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6] 10/04/2019
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6] 10/04/2019
Rep. Cloud, Michael [R-TX-27] 10/04/2019
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/04/2019
Rep. Keller, Fred [R-PA-12] 10/04/2019
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 10/04/2019
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 10/04/2019
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 10/04/2019
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 10/04/2019
Rep. Cheney, Liz [R-WY-At Large] 10/04/2019
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 10/04/2019
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 10/04/2019
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 10/04/2019
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8] 10/04/2019
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 10/04/2019
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 10/08/2019
Rep. Murphy, Gregory [R-NC-3] 10/08/2019
Rep. Gianforte, Greg [R-MT-At Large] 10/08/2019
Rep. Cline, Ben [R-VA-6] 10/08/2019
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 10/08/2019
Rep. Riggleman, Denver [R-VA-5] 10/08/2019
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-16] 10/08/2019
Rep. Timmons, William R. IV [R-SC-4] 10/08/2019
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 10/08/2019
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 10/08/2019
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 10/08/2019
Rep. Comer, James [R-KY-1] 10/08/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 10/08/2019
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 10/08/2019
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 10/08/2019
Rep. Joyce, John [R-PA-13] 10/08/2019
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 10/08/2019
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 10/08/2019
Rep. Hern, Kevin [R-OK-1] 10/08/2019
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 10/08/2019
Rep. Fulcher, Russ [R-ID-1] 10/08/2019
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 10/08/2019
Rep. Rose, John W. [R-TN-6] 10/08/2019
Rep. Spano, Ross [R-FL-15] 10/08/2019
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 10/08/2019
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 10/08/2019
Rep. Armstrong, Kelly [R-ND-At Large] 10/08/2019
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 10/08/2019
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 10/08/2019
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 10/08/2019
Rep. Arrington, Jodey C. [R-TX-19] 10/08/2019
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 10/08/2019
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 10/08/2019
Rep. Estes, Ron [R-KS-4] 10/08/2019
Rep. Higgins, Clay [R-LA-3] 10/08/2019
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 10/11/2019
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 10/11/2019
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 10/11/2019
Rep. Roy, Chip [R-TX-21] 10/11/2019
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 10/11/2019
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 10/11/2019
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-11] 10/11/2019
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 10/11/2019
Rep. Hagedorn, Jim [R-MN-1] 10/11/2019
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 10/11/2019
Rep. Waltz, Michael [R-FL-6] 10/11/2019
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 10/11/2019
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 10/11/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Anthony [R-OH-16] 10/11/2019
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1] 10/11/2019
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 10/11/2019
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18] 10/11/2019
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 10/11/2019
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 10/11/2019
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 10/15/2019
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 10/15/2019
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 10/15/2019
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 10/15/2019
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 10/15/2019
Rep. Radewagen, Aumua Amata Coleman [R-AS-At Large] 10/15/2019
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2] 10/15/2019
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-15] 10/15/2019
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/15/2019
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 10/15/2019
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 10/15/2019
Rep. Kustoff, David [R-TN-8] 10/15/2019
Rep. Crenshaw, Dan [R-TX-2] 10/15/2019
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 10/15/2019
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 10/15/2019
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 10/15/2019
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 10/15/2019
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 10/15/2019
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 10/15/2019
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 10/15/2019
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 10/15/2019
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 10/15/2019
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 10/15/2019
Rep. Baird, James R. [R-IN-4] 10/15/2019
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 10/15/2019
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 10/16/2019
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 10/16/2019
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 10/16/2019
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 10/16/2019
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 10/16/2019
Rep. Miller, Carol D. [R-WV-3] 10/16/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 10/16/2019
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 10/16/2019
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 10/16/2019
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 10/16/2019
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 10/18/2019
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/18/2019
Rep. Hollingsworth, Trey [R-IN-9] 10/18/2019
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 10/21/2019
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/21/2019
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 10/21/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ethics09/27/2019 Referred to

As of 09/27/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.Res.604 - Condemning and censuring Adam Schiff, Representative of California's 28th Congressional District.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.604. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/27/2019)

This resolution censures and condemns Representative Adam Schiff of California for certain misleading conduct.