Text: H.Res.604 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/27/2019)

 
[Congressional Bills 116th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]
[H. Res. 604 Introduced in House (IH)]

<DOC>






116th CONGRESS
  1st Session
H. RES. 604

 Condemning and censuring Adam Schiff, Representative of California's 
                      28th Congressional District.


_______________________________________________________________________


                    IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

                           September 27, 2019

Mr. Biggs submitted the following resolution; which was referred to the 
                          Committee on Ethics

_______________________________________________________________________

                               RESOLUTION


 
 Condemning and censuring Adam Schiff, Representative of California's 
                      28th Congressional District.

Whereas, President Trump released the transcript of a call between him and the 
        President of Ukraine;
Whereas, President Trump subsequently released the whistleblower complaint of 
        August 12, 2019;
Whereas, in a September 26, 2019, hearing on the whistleblower complaint, House 
        Intelligence Committee Chairman Adam Schiff purported to relay the 
        content of the phone call to the American people;
Whereas, instead of quoting directly from the available transcript, Chairman 
        Schiff manufactured a false retelling of the conversation between 
        President Trump and President Zelensky;
Whereas, this egregiously false and fabricated retelling had no relationship to 
        the call itself;
Whereas, these actions of Chairman Schiff misled the American people, bring 
        disrepute upon the House of Representatives, and make a mockery of the 
        impeachment process, one of this chamber's most solemn constitutional 
        duties;
Whereas, for more than two years, Chairman Schiff has spread false accusations 
        that the Trump Campaign colluded with Russia;
Whereas, on March 20, 2017, then-Ranking Member Schiff read out false 
        allegations from the Steele dossier accusing numerous Trump associates 
        of colluding with Russia;
Whereas, then-Ranking Member Schiff falsely claimed in a March 2017 interview to 
        have ``more than circumstantial evidence'' of collusion with Russia;
Whereas, then-Ranking Member Schiff negotiated with Russian comedians who he 
        believed to be Ukrainian officials to obtain materials to damage the 
        President of the United States politically;
Whereas, members of the Intelligence Committee have lost faith in his 
        objectivity and capabilities as Chairman, with every Republican member 
        on the Committee having signed a letter calling for his immediate 
        resignation as Chairman; and
Whereas, Chairman Schiff has hindered the ability of the Intelligence Committee 
        to fulfill its oversight responsibilities of the Intelligence Community, 
        an indispensable pillar of our national security: Now therefore, be it
    Resolved, That--
            (1) the House of Representatives censures and condemns 
        Representative Adam Schiff for conduct that misleads the 
        American people in a way that is not befitting an elected 
        Member of the House of Representatives;
            (2) Representative Adam Schiff will forthwith present 
        himself in the well of the House for the pronouncement of 
        censure; and
            (3) Representative Adam Schiff will be censured with the 
        public reading of this resolution by the Speaker.
                                 <all>

Share This