There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing support for the designation of the week beginning on October 13, 2019, as National Wildlife Refuge Week.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
10/15/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
10/16/2019Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
10/15/2019Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
10/15/2019Introduced in House

Cosponsors (34)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 10/15/2019
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 10/15/2019
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 10/15/2019
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 10/15/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1]* 10/15/2019
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large]* 10/15/2019
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 10/15/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 10/15/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 10/15/2019
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 10/15/2019
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 10/15/2019
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 10/15/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 10/15/2019
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 10/15/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 10/15/2019
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 10/15/2019
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 10/15/2019
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 10/15/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 10/15/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 10/15/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 10/15/2019
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 10/15/2019
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 10/15/2019
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 10/15/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 10/15/2019
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/16/2019
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/16/2019
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 10/16/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 10/17/2019
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 10/17/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 10/17/2019
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 10/17/2019
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 10/18/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/30/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources10/15/2019 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife10/16/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.