There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Requiring that all impeachment inquiry related hearings, witness interviews and communications, document productions and examinations, proceedings, and other related work shall be done in an open setting and in public view.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
10/16/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
10/16/2019Referred to the Committee on Rules, and in addition to the Committee on Ethics, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
10/16/2019Referred to the Committee on Rules, and in addition to the Committee on Ethics, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
10/16/2019Introduced in House

Cosponsors (45)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-10]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Davidson, Warren [R-OH-8]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Roy, Chip [R-TX-21]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Cloud, Michael [R-TX-27]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1]* 10/16/2019
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Wright, Ron [R-TX-6]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 10/16/2019
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8]* 10/16/2019
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 10/17/2019
Rep. Spano, Ross [R-FL-15] 10/17/2019
Rep. Meuser, Daniel [R-PA-9] 10/17/2019
Rep. Rose, John W. [R-TN-6] 10/18/2019
Rep. Curtis, John R. [R-UT-3] 10/18/2019
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 10/18/2019
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/18/2019
Rep. Bishop, Dan [R-NC-9] 10/18/2019
Rep. Johnson, Dusty [R-SD-At Large] 10/18/2019
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6] 10/18/2019
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 10/22/2019
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 10/22/2019
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 10/23/2019
Rep. Gooden, Lance [R-TX-5] 10/29/2019
Rep. Keller, Fred [R-PA-12] 10/30/2019
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4] 10/30/2019
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 11/19/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Rules10/16/2019 Referred to
House Ethics10/16/2019 Referred to

As of 09/30/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.Res.633 - Requiring that all impeachment inquiry related hearings, witness interviews and communications, document productions and examinations, proceedings, and other related work shall be done in an open setting and in public view.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.633. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/16/2019)

This resolution (1) disapproves of the actions led by the Speaker of the House, Nancy Pelosi, to conduct work related to matters of impeachment in a closed and classified setting; (2) requires all impeachment related matters to be done in an open setting and in public view; and (3) demands the Speaker and the chair of each committee engaged in an impeachment inquiry of any kind to give each Member of the House a minimum of 48-hours notice before conducting such matters.