Text: H.Res.711 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/19/2019)

 
[Congressional Bills 116th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]
[H. Res. 711 Introduced in House (IH)]

<DOC>






116th CONGRESS
  1st Session
H. RES. 711

   Recognizing and celebrating the 200th anniversary of the entry of 
           Alabama into the Union as the twenty-second State.


_______________________________________________________________________


                    IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

                           November 19, 2019

Mrs. Roby (for herself, Mr. Aderholt, Mr. Brooks of Alabama, Mr. Byrne, 
Mr. Palmer, Mr. Rogers of Alabama, and Ms. Sewell of Alabama) submitted 
   the following resolution; which was referred to the Committee on 
                          Oversight and Reform

_______________________________________________________________________

                               RESOLUTION


 
   Recognizing and celebrating the 200th anniversary of the entry of 
           Alabama into the Union as the twenty-second State.

Whereas the United States Congress created the Alabama Territory from the 
        eastern half of the Mississippi Territory on March 3, 1817;
Whereas, by 1819, the birth and growth of cities, towns, and communities in the 
        Alabama Territory ensured that the population of the territory had 
        developed sufficiently to achieve the minimum number of inhabitants 
        required by Congress to qualify for statehood;
Whereas the United States Congress and President James Monroe approved statehood 
        for the Alabama Territory on December 14, 1819, making it the Nation's 
        twenty-second State;
Whereas December 14, 2019, marks the 200th anniversary of the attainment of 
        statehood by Alabama; and
Whereas this bicentennial anniversary is a monumental occasion to celebrate and 
        commemorate the achievements of the great State of Alabama: Now, 
        therefore, be it
    Resolved, That the House of Representatives recognizes and 
celebrates the 200th anniversary of the entry of Alabama into the Union 
as the twenty-second State.
                                 <all>

Share This Section