There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives that the International Olympic Committee should correct Jim Thorpe's Olympic records for his unprecedented accomplishments during the 1912 Olympic Games.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
11/20/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
03/04/2020Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
03/04/2020Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
11/20/2019Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
11/20/2019Introduced in House

Cosponsors (39)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 11/20/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21]* 11/20/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 11/20/2019
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 11/20/2019
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 11/20/2019
Rep. Hern, Kevin [R-OK-1]* 11/20/2019
Rep. Horn, Kendra S. [D-OK-5]* 11/20/2019
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-16]* 11/20/2019
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 11/20/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 11/20/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 11/20/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9]* 11/20/2019
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 11/20/2019
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2]* 11/20/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 11/20/2019
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1]* 11/20/2019
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-10]* 11/20/2019
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13]* 11/20/2019
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35]* 11/20/2019
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 11/20/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 11/26/2019
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 11/26/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/10/2019
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 01/02/2020
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 01/27/2020
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-15] 01/27/2020
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 01/30/2020
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 02/04/2020
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 03/03/2020
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 03/03/2020
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 03/03/2020
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 03/03/2020
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 03/03/2020
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 03/03/2020
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 03/03/2020
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 03/04/2020
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 03/04/2020
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 03/04/2020
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 03/04/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs11/20/2019 Referred to
03/04/2020 Markup by

As of 08/07/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.Res.720 - Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives that the International Olympic Committee should correct Jim Thorpe's Olympic records for his unprecedented accomplishments during the 1912 Olympic Games.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.720. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/20/2019)

This resolution expresses the sense of the House of Representatives that the International Olympic Committee should officially recognize Jim Thorpe's athletic achievements as the sole Gold Medalist in the 1912 pentathlon and decathlon events and correct these inaccuracies in the official Olympic books.