There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Encouraging all nations to end sexual violence against girls through in-country data-driven reforms as demonstrated by multiple African nations.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
11/20/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
03/04/2020Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
03/04/2020Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
11/20/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
11/20/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
11/20/2019Introduced in House

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21]* 11/20/2019
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 11/20/2019
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 11/20/2019
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 11/20/2019
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1]* 11/20/2019
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 11/20/2019
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 11/20/2019
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 11/20/2019
Rep. Houlahan, Chrissy [D-PA-6]* 11/20/2019
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 11/20/2019
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 11/20/2019
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 11/20/2019
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 11/20/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 11/20/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6]* 11/20/2019
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16]* 11/20/2019
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 11/20/2019
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 11/20/2019
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 12/06/2019
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 12/06/2019
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 12/06/2019
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 12/06/2019
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 12/06/2019
Rep. Burchett, Tim [R-TN-2] 12/06/2019
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 12/06/2019
Rep. Schrier, Kim [D-WA-8] 12/06/2019
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 12/06/2019
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 12/06/2019
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5] 12/06/2019
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 12/19/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 12/19/2019
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 12/19/2019
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 02/12/2020
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-10] 03/04/2020
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 03/04/2020
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 03/04/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs11/20/2019 Referred to
03/04/2020 Markup by
House Education and Labor11/20/2019 Referred to

As of 08/12/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.Res.723 - Encouraging all nations to end sexual violence against girls through in-country data-driven reforms as demonstrated by multiple African nations.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.723. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/20/2019)

This resolution recognizes sexual violence against girls as a serious global issue. The resolution encourages the implementation of certain measures to protect girls from abuse, including (1) increased international efforts to eliminate female genital mutilation and cutting, and (2) the widespread dissemination of surveys that measure levels of sexual violence.