There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing support for the designation of the week of September 20 through September 26, 2020, as "Purple Star Families Week".


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/26/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
11/26/2019Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
11/26/2019Introduced in House

Cosponsors (61)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Murphy, Gregory [R-NC-3]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Gonzalez, Anthony [R-OH-16]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Arrington, Jodey C. [R-TX-19]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Cline, Ben [R-VA-6]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Burchett, Tim [R-TN-2]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-11]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Cloud, Michael [R-TX-27]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Joyce, John [R-PA-13]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Steil, Bryan [R-WI-1]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Taylor, Van [R-TX-3]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Pence, Greg [R-IN-6]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Crenshaw, Dan [R-TX-2]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Steube, W. Gregory [R-FL-17]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Lee, Susie [D-NV-3]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Baird, James R. [R-IN-4]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Kustoff, David [R-TN-8]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Hern, Kevin [R-OK-1]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Balderson, Troy [R-OH-12]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Reschenthaler, Guy [R-PA-14]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4]* 11/26/2019
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 12/04/2019
Rep. Armstrong, Kelly [R-ND-At Large] 12/04/2019
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 12/04/2019
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 12/05/2019
Rep. Keller, Fred [R-PA-12] 12/05/2019
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 12/05/2019
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 12/05/2019
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 12/11/2019
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 12/11/2019
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 12/11/2019
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 12/11/2019
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 12/11/2019
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 01/07/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Reform11/26/2019 Referred to

As of 01/25/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.Res.734 - Expressing support for the designation of the week of September 20 through September 26, 2020, as "Purple Star Families Week".


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.734. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/26/2019)

This resolution supports the designation of the week of September 20-September 26, 2020, as Purple Star Families Week.