There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Urging the Republic of India to end the restrictions on communications and mass detentions in Jammu and Kashmir as swiftly as possible and preserve religious freedom for all residents.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
12/06/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
12/06/2019Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
12/06/2019Introduced in House

Cosponsors (68)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Watkins, Steve [R-KS-2]* 12/06/2019
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/11/2019
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3] 12/11/2019
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/11/2019
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 12/11/2019
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 12/11/2019
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 12/11/2019
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 12/13/2019
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/13/2019
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 12/13/2019
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 12/13/2019
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 12/13/2019
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 12/13/2019
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1] 12/13/2019
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 12/13/2019
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 12/13/2019
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 12/13/2019
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 12/13/2019
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 12/13/2019
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 12/19/2019
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 12/19/2019
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/19/2019
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10] 12/19/2019
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 12/19/2019
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 12/19/2019
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 12/19/2019
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 12/19/2019
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 12/19/2019
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 12/19/2019
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 01/07/2020
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 01/07/2020
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8] 01/07/2020
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 01/07/2020
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 01/07/2020
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/08/2020
Rep. Davids, Sharice [D-KS-3] 01/08/2020
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 01/14/2020
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 01/14/2020
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/14/2020
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 01/14/2020
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14] 01/17/2020
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 01/17/2020
Rep. Rose, Max [D-NY-11] 01/24/2020
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/24/2020
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 01/24/2020
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/24/2020
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 01/24/2020
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1] 01/27/2020
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 02/04/2020
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 02/04/2020
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 02/04/2020
Rep. Pappas, Chris [D-NH-1] 02/04/2020
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. [D-IL-4] 02/05/2020
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 02/05/2020
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 02/06/2020
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 02/06/2020
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 02/06/2020
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 02/12/2020
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 02/12/2020
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 02/13/2020
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 02/21/2020
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 02/26/2020
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 03/02/2020
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2] 03/02/2020
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 03/04/2020
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 06/11/2020
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 09/21/2020
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 10/30/2020
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [R-NJ-2] 01/15/2020 03/09/2020 H1549

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Foreign Affairs12/06/2019 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.745.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.745. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/06/2019)

This resolution recognizes the security challenges faced by India in Jammu and Kashmir. The resolution urges India to employ certain measures to uphold human rights and refrain from the use of violence against minority groups, protestors, and detainees.