Text: H.Res.757 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/10/2019)

 
[Congressional Bills 116th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]
[H. Res. 757 Introduced in House (IH)]

<DOC>






116th CONGRESS
  1st Session
H. RES. 757

 Calling for the resignation and disbarment of United States Attorney 
            General William P. Barr, and for other purposes.


_______________________________________________________________________


                    IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

                           December 10, 2019

Mr. Rush submitted the following resolution; which was referred to the 
                       Committee on the Judiciary

_______________________________________________________________________

                               RESOLUTION


 
 Calling for the resignation and disbarment of United States Attorney 
            General William P. Barr, and for other purposes.

Whereas, on March 24, 2019, United States Attorney General William P. Barr 
        deliberately mischaracterized the ``Report On The Investigation Into 
        Russian Interference In The 2016 Presidential Election'' issued by 
        Special Counsel Robert S. Mueller, III;
Whereas, on March 25, 2019, at Attorney General Barr's direction, the Department 
        of Justice ceased defending the Patient Protection and Affordable Care 
        Act (Public Law 111-148), a duly enacted law under the United States 
        Constitution;
Whereas, on April 24, 2019, Attorney General Barr directed then-Acting Assistant 
        Attorney General John Gore of the Department of Justice's Civil Rights 
        Division to defy a subpoena from the House Oversight and Reform 
        Committee pertaining to its investigation of the 2020 census;
Whereas, on July 8, 2019, Attorney General Barr deliberately mischaracterized 
        the legal reasoning behind the Trump administration's desire to add a 
        citizenship question to the 2020 census and abruptly removed career 
        Department of Justice attorneys in an unprecedented attempt to undermine 
        a ruling by the Supreme Court of the United States;
Whereas, on July 16, 2019, Attorney General Barr ignored the recommendation of 
        the Department of Justice's Civil Rights Division by declining to bring 
        charges against the New York Police Department officer in the death of 
        Eric Garner;
Whereas, on July 17, 2019, the United States House of Representatives voted to 
        hold Attorney General Barr in criminal contempt of Congress for his 
        refusal to comply with a duly-issued subpoena and deliberate obstruction 
        of congressional oversight authority;
Whereas, on December 4, 2019, Attorney General Barr threatened the withholding 
        of police protection from communities that do not show ``support and 
        respect'' to law enforcement, a statement that has been interpreted as 
        being directed at communities of color that protest police violence;
Whereas Attorney General Barr has perpetuated and promulgated conspiracy 
        theories that have been repeatedly debunked by United States law 
        enforcement and intelligence agencies, including before a Senate 
        Appropriations Committee hearing, where he referred to legitimate and 
        legal law enforcement surveillance as ``spying'', and while traveling 
        abroad to meet with foreign intelligence officials where he has 
        continued to spread this disinformation;
Whereas Attorney General Barr has used taxpayer funds for international travel 
        to seek foreign assistance in investigating a domestic political rival 
        of the President of the United States;
Whereas Attorney General Barr has sought to undermine the Department of Justice 
        inspector general's report ``Review of Four FISA Applications and Other 
        Aspects of the FBI's Crossfire Hurricane Investigation'', regarding the 
        Federal Bureau of Investigation's investigation of the Trump campaign; 
        and
Whereas Attorney General Barr has refused to recuse himself from any Ukraine-
        related matters in which he is allegedly involved: Now, therefore, be it
    Resolved, That the House of Representatives--
            (1) condemns United States Attorney General William P. Barr 
        for his despicable comments and actions;
            (2) calls on United States Attorney General William P. Barr 
        to resign;
            (3) calls on the Virginia State Bar to remove United States 
        Attorney General William P. Barr from its rolls;
            (4) calls on the New York State Bar Association to remove 
        United States Attorney General William P. Barr from its rolls;
            (5) calls on the District of Columbia Bar to remove United 
        States Attorney General William P. Barr from its rolls;
            (6) reaffirms support for the diversity of the United 
        States; and
            (7) reaffirms, in the strongest terms, its support for and 
        commitment to the 14th Amendment to the United States 
        Constitution.
                                 <all>

Share This Section