Summary: H.Res.758 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed House (12/11/2019)

This resolution sets forth the rule for consideration of H.R. 3 (Lower Drug Costs Now Act of 2019), H.R. 5038 (Farm Workforce Modernization Act of 2019), and S. 1790 (National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2020).

The chair of the Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence may insert in the Congressional Record by December 13, 2019, such material as the chair may deem explanatory of intelligence authorization measures for FY2018-FY2020.

It shall be in order at any time on the legislative day of December 20, 2019, for the Speaker of the House to suspend the rules.

The resolution waives a specified requirement of Rule XIII (Calendar and Committee Reports) to allow consideration of any resolution reported from the Committee on Rules through such date.

Certain proceedings may take place on any legislative day of (1) the first session of the 116th Congress after December 12, 2019, and (2) the second session of the 116th Congress before January 7, 2020.