There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Encouraging public schools to design and teach a curriculum about the history of anti-Semitism and the Holocaust, and the vital and historic importance of the Jewish State of Israel.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/09/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
01/28/2020Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
01/14/2020Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H215)
01/09/2020Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
01/09/2020Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
01/09/2020Introduced in House

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1]* 01/09/2020
Rep. Kustoff, David [R-TN-8]* 01/09/2020
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 01/13/2020
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 01/14/2020
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 01/17/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary01/09/2020 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties01/28/2020 Referred to
House Education and Labor01/09/2020 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.782.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.782. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/09/2020)

This resolution condemns the rise of anti-Semitic attacks and calls on law enforcement officials to hold perpetrators accountable. The resolution also encourages public schools to teach about the history of anti-Semitism, the Holocaust, and the historic importance of the creation of the Jewish State of Israel.