Text: H.Res.782 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/09/2020)

 
[Congressional Bills 116th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]
[H. Res. 782 Introduced in House (IH)]

<DOC>






116th CONGRESS
  2d Session
H. RES. 782

 Encouraging public schools to design and teach a curriculum about the 
history of anti-Semitism and the Holocaust, and the vital and historic 
               importance of the Jewish State of Israel.


_______________________________________________________________________


                    IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

                            January 9, 2020

   Mr. Budd (for himself, Mr. Zeldin, and Mr. Kustoff of Tennessee) 
submitted the following resolution; which was referred to the Committee 
  on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Education and 
 Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in 
   each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the 
                jurisdiction of the committee concerned

_______________________________________________________________________

                               RESOLUTION


 
 Encouraging public schools to design and teach a curriculum about the 
history of anti-Semitism and the Holocaust, and the vital and historic 
               importance of the Jewish State of Israel.

Whereas, on January 1, 2020, in the Williamsburg neighborhood of Brooklyn, New 
        York, two women punched a Jewish man in the throat and taunted him with 
        anti-Semitic threats;
Whereas, on December 28, 2019, in Monsey, New York, a man wielding a large knife 
        entered a Rabbi's home and stabbed five people during a Hanukkah 
        celebration;
Whereas, on December 26, 2019, in Brooklyn, New York, a woman yelled anti-
        Semitic slurs at a Jewish woman and her son and physically assaulted the 
        mother;
Whereas, on December 24, 2019, in Asheville, North Carolina, vandals painted an 
        8 foot swastika onto a mural on the building of Static Age Records;
Whereas, on December 24, 2019, in the Crown Heights neighborhood of Brooklyn, 
        New York, an Orthodox man was approached by a group of individuals who 
        punched him in the back of the head and fled;
Whereas, on December 10, 2019, in Jersey City, New Jersey, two attackers 
        targeted a Kosher supermarket and killed three civilians and one police 
        officer;
Whereas, on November 19, 2019, a Syracuse University professor received an anti-
        Semitic email with the subject line ``JEW'' in which she was told to 
        ``get in the oven where you belong'';
Whereas, on Saturday, April 27, 2019, a gunman named John Earnest opened fire 
        inside the Chabad Congregation in Poway, California on the last day of 
        Passover leaving one dead and three injured;
Whereas, on October 27, 2018, White supremacist Robert Gregory Bowers, 46, 
        conducted a deadly shooting spree at the Tree of Life synagogue in 
        Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, killing 11 and wounding seven more, Bowers 
        appears to have been motivated by anti-Semitic convictions and while in 
        custody and receiving medical treatment, Bowers told a SWAT officer he 
        ``wanted all Jews to die'';
Whereas, on August 12, 2017, White supremacist Richard Spencer led a rally in 
        Charlottesville, Virginia, where hundreds of his followers chanted, 
        ``Jews will not replace us'', and this extremist demonstration turned 
        violent when a neo-Nazi sympathizer drove a vehicle into a crowd, which 
        resulted in the death of one peaceful demonstrator, and two Virginia 
        State police officers died in the line of duty that day as well;
Whereas, as a result of the Boycott, Divestment and Sanctions Movement, Jewish 
        students on college campuses across America have been exposed to rampant 
        anti-Semitism;
Whereas learning how and why the Holocaust happened in schools would provide 
        context for students to learn about the history of anti-Semitism;
Whereas since its creation in 1948, Israel has served as a refuge for Jews 
        around the world to escape persecution; and
Whereas there has also been a significant amount of other anti-Israel and anti-
        Semitic hatred in the United States and around the world that must be 
        strongly condemned: Now, therefore, be it
    Resolved, That it is the sense that the House of Representatives--
            (1) condemns the rise of anti-Semitic attacks against Jews 
        in the United States;
            (2) calls on Federal law enforcement officials, working 
        with State and local officials, to hold the perpetrators of 
        anti-Semitic attacks accountable and bring such perpetrators to 
        justice; and
            (3) encourages public schools throughout the country to 
        design and teach a curriculum about the history of anti-
        Semitism and the Holocaust, and the historic importance of the 
        creation of the Jewish State of Israel in 1948 that served as a 
        refuge for Jews all over the world to escape persecution 
        following the Holocaust.
                                 <all>

Share This