Text: H.Res.788 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/10/2020)

 
[Congressional Bills 116th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]
[H. Res. 788 Introduced in House (IH)]

<DOC>






116th CONGRESS
  2d Session
H. RES. 788

Expressing the sense of Congress that the Office of the Speaker of the 
                            House is vacant.


_______________________________________________________________________


                    IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

                            January 10, 2020

Mr. Griffith (for himself, Mr. Meadows, Mr. Hice of Georgia, Mr. Gosar, 
   Mr. Biggs, Mr. Mooney of West Virginia, Mr. Davidson of Ohio, Mr. 
 Cloud, Mr. Carter of Georgia, Mr. Budd, Mr. Burgess, Mr. DesJarlais, 
Mr. Buck, Mr. Perry, Mr. Gaetz, Mr. Harris, Mr. Duncan, Mr. Byrne, Mr. 
   David P. Roe of Tennessee, Mr. Cline, and Mr. Roy) submitted the 
   following resolution; which was referred to the Committee on Rules

_______________________________________________________________________

                               RESOLUTION


 
Expressing the sense of Congress that the Office of the Speaker of the 
                            House is vacant.

Whereas, on December 18, 2019, the House of Representatives passed H. Res. 755, 
        impeaching Donald John Trump, President of the United States;
Whereas, on December 18, 2019, a motion to reconsider H. Res. 755 was laid upon 
        the table;
Whereas laying a motion to reconsider on the table is an act that 
        ``extinguish[es] reconsideration'' of the bill in question;
Whereas the motion to lay on the table is used in the House for a final, adverse 
        disposition of a matter without debate;
Whereas after a bill is passed, there can be no further alteration of it in any 
        point;
Whereas, upon adoption of the Articles of Impeachment, which do not name 
        managers, the House subsequently adopts resolutions electing managers to 
        present the articles before the Senate, notifying the Senate of the 
        adoption of articles and election of managers, and authorizing the 
        managers to prepare for and to conduct the trial in the Senate;
Whereas President Andrew Johnson was impeached by the House of Representatives 
        on March 2, 1868, and the Articles of Impeachment against him were 
        delivered to the Senate on March 4, 1868;
Whereas President William Jefferson Clinton was impeached by the House of 
        Representatives on December 19, 1998, and the Articles of Impeachment 
        against him were delivered to the Senate the same day;
Whereas President Donald John Trump was impeached by the House of 
        Representatives on December 18, 2019, and the Articles of Impeachment 
        against him have yet to be delivered to the Senate;
Whereas no further action can be taken by the House of Representatives to 
        address H. Res. 755;
Whereas it is the duty of the Speaker of the House to oversee election of 
        managers to carry the Articles in obedience to the resolution of the 
        House to the bar of the Senate, the House having previously informed the 
        Senate;
Whereas H. Res. 755 is the resolution of the House to inform the Senate;
Whereas failure to present H. Res. 755 implies physical inability to discharge 
        the full duties of the Speaker of the House of Representatives; and
Whereas Clause 8(b)(3)(C) of Rule One of the House Rules states ``a vacancy in 
        the Office of Speaker may exist by reason of the physical inability of 
        the Speaker to discharge the duties of the office'': Now, therefore, be 
        it
    Resolved,
            (1) That Speaker of the House Nancy D. Pelosi is unable to 
        perform an essential part of her administrative duties and is 
        thus incapacitated; and
            (2) that incapacity creates a vacancy in the office of the 
        Speaker of the House of Representatives in accordance with 
        Clause 8(b)(3)(C) of Rule One of the House Rules.
                                 <all>

Share This Section