There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

Condemning the Government of Iran's state-sponsored persecution of its Baha'i minority and its continued violation of' the Universal Declaration of Human Rights and the International Covenant on Civil and Political Rights.

Official Title as Introduced

Condemning the Government of Iran's state-sponsored persecution of its Baha'i minority and its continued violation of the International Covenants on Human Rights.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
12/07/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6867-6868)
01/30/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date All Actions
12/07/2020-12:42pmThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
12/07/2020-12:41pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/07/2020-12:41pmOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6867-6868)
12/07/2020-12:33pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 823.
12/07/2020-12:33pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6867-6869)
12/07/2020-12:32pmMr. Raskin moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
10/01/2020Subcommittee on Middle East, North Africa and International Terrorism Discharged.
10/01/2020Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
10/01/2020Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
02/21/2020Referred to the Subcommittee on Middle East, North Africa and International Terrorism.
01/30/2020Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
01/30/2020Introduced in House

Cosponsors (94)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/30/2020
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 01/30/2020
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 01/30/2020
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/30/2020
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/30/2020
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10]* 01/30/2020
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/30/2020
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 01/30/2020
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2]* 01/30/2020
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 02/25/2020
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 02/25/2020
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/27/2020
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 02/27/2020
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/27/2020
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/10/2020
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 04/17/2020
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 04/17/2020
Rep. Stauber, Pete [R-MN-8] 04/17/2020
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 04/17/2020
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 05/14/2020
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 05/14/2020
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 05/28/2020
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 05/28/2020
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/28/2020
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45] 06/25/2020
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 06/25/2020
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/25/2020
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/25/2020
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 07/01/2020
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 07/13/2020
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/13/2020
Rep. Balderson, Troy [R-OH-12] 07/20/2020
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/21/2020
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 07/27/2020
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 07/27/2020
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 07/29/2020
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 07/29/2020
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 07/29/2020
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1] 07/29/2020
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 07/29/2020
Rep. Burchett, Tim [R-TN-2] 07/29/2020
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 07/29/2020
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/30/2020
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 07/30/2020
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/30/2020
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 07/30/2020
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 07/30/2020
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/30/2020
Rep. Timmons, William R. IV [R-SC-4] 07/30/2020
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 07/30/2020
Rep. Schrier, Kim [D-WA-8] 07/30/2020
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 07/31/2020
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 07/31/2020
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 08/07/2020
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 08/07/2020
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 08/07/2020
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10] 08/07/2020
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 08/07/2020
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49] 08/07/2020
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 08/14/2020
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 08/14/2020
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 08/14/2020
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 08/14/2020
Rep. Fletcher, Lizzie [D-TX-7] 08/14/2020
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3] 08/28/2020
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 08/28/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 08/28/2020
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/01/2020
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 09/04/2020
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 09/11/2020
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 09/11/2020
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 09/15/2020
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 09/15/2020
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11] 09/15/2020
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 09/17/2020
Rep. Taylor, Van [R-TX-3] 09/23/2020
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 09/23/2020
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 09/29/2020
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 09/29/2020
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 09/29/2020
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-10] 09/29/2020
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 09/30/2020
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 09/30/2020
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 10/20/2020
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 10/27/2020
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/27/2020
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/12/2020
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 11/12/2020
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 11/17/2020
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/19/2020
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 12/02/2020
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 12/02/2020
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 12/02/2020
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 12/07/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Foreign Affairs01/30/2020 Referred to
10/01/2020 Markup by
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Middle East, North Africa and International Terrorism02/21/2020 Referred to
10/01/2020 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.823. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (12/07/2020)

This resolution condemns Iran's state-sponsored persecution of its Baha'i minority and its continued violation of human rights agreements. Further, it calls on Iran to immediately release all imprisoned or detained Baha'is, and it urges the President and the Department of State to impose sanctions on Iranian officials and others who are responsible for serious human rights abuses, including abuses against Iran's Baha'i community.