There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing support for the designation of the week of February 24 through February 28, 2020, as "Public Schools Week".


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/21/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
02/21/2020Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
02/21/2020Introduced in House

Cosponsors (127)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-15]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 02/21/2020
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 02/21/2020
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8]* 02/21/2020
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Brindisi, Anthony [D-NY-22]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Neguse, Joe [D-CO-2]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Van Drew, Jefferson [R-NJ-2]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/21/2020
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Haaland, Debra A. [D-NM-1]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 02/21/2020
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Hayes, Jahana [D-CT-5]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Davids, Sharice [D-KS-3]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Lee, Susie [D-NV-3]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 02/21/2020
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6]* 02/21/2020
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Golden, Jared F. [D-ME-2]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Finkenauer, Abby [D-IA-1]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-2]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 02/21/2020
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 02/25/2020
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 02/25/2020
Rep. Dean, Madeleine [D-PA-4] 02/25/2020
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/25/2020
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 02/25/2020
Rep. Houlahan, Chrissy [D-PA-6] 02/25/2020
Rep. Levin, Andy [D-MI-9] 02/25/2020
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 02/25/2020
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 02/25/2020
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 02/25/2020
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/25/2020
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 02/25/2020
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/25/2020
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 02/25/2020
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 02/25/2020
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-17] 02/25/2020
Rep. Comer, James [R-KY-1] 02/25/2020
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 02/25/2020
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 02/26/2020
Rep. Stauber, Pete [R-MN-8] 02/26/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 02/26/2020
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 02/26/2020
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6] 02/26/2020
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 02/27/2020
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 02/27/2020
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 02/27/2020
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 02/28/2020
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 02/28/2020
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 02/28/2020
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/02/2020
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 03/04/2020
Rep. Crenshaw, Dan [R-TX-2] 03/04/2020
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/04/2020
Rep. Plaskett, Stacey E. [D-VI-At Large] 03/09/2020
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 03/09/2020
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 03/10/2020
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 03/13/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Reform02/21/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.862. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/21/2020)

This resolution supports the designation of Public Schools Week.