There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Recognizing the importance of the blueberry industry to the United States of America and supporting the designation of July 2020 as "National Blueberry Month".


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/02/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
03/13/2020Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
03/02/2020Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
03/02/2020Introduced in House

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/02/2020
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 03/05/2020
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 03/10/2020
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 03/11/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Agriculture03/02/2020 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research03/13/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.882. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/02/2020)

This resolution (1) supports the designation of National Blueberry Month; and (2) recognizes the contributions of American growers and their families, and that purchasing American grown blueberries supports farmers, jobs, and the economy.