There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Calling on the President to invoke the Defense Production Act to respond to COVID-19.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/23/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
03/23/2020Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
03/23/2020Introduced in House

Cosponsors (103)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7]* 03/23/2020
Rep. Porter, Katie [D-CA-45]* 03/23/2020
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 03/23/2020
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/23/2020
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 03/23/2020
Rep. Sherrill, Mikie [D-NJ-11]* 03/23/2020
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/23/2020
Rep. Gonzalez, Anthony [R-OH-16]* 03/23/2020
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2]* 03/23/2020
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 03/23/2020
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 03/23/2020
Rep. Taylor, Van [R-TX-3]* 03/23/2020
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 03/23/2020
Rep. Allred, Colin Z. [D-TX-32] 03/26/2020
Rep. Axne, Cynthia [D-IA-3] 03/26/2020
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 03/26/2020
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 03/26/2020
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/26/2020
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 03/26/2020
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-2] 03/26/2020
Rep. Brindisi, Anthony [D-NY-22] 03/26/2020
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 03/26/2020
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/26/2020
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-1] 03/26/2020
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 03/26/2020
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 03/26/2020
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 03/26/2020
Rep. Cisneros, Gilbert Ray, Jr. [D-CA-39] 03/26/2020
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/26/2020
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/26/2020
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/26/2020
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/26/2020
Rep. Craig, Angie [D-MN-2] 03/26/2020
Rep. Crow, Jason [D-CO-6] 03/26/2020
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/26/2020
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/26/2020
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/26/2020
Rep. Delgado, Antonio [D-NY-19] 03/26/2020
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 03/26/2020
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 03/26/2020
Rep. Escobar, Veronica [D-TX-16] 03/26/2020
Rep. Fletcher, Lizzie [D-TX-7] 03/26/2020
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/26/2020
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 03/26/2020
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29] 03/26/2020
Rep. Garcia, Jesus G. "Chuy" [D-IL-4] 03/26/2020
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 03/26/2020
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/26/2020
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 03/26/2020
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 03/26/2020
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 03/26/2020
Rep. Houlahan, Chrissy [D-PA-6] 03/26/2020
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 03/26/2020
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 03/26/2020
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 03/26/2020
Rep. Kim, Andy [D-NJ-3] 03/26/2020
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 03/26/2020
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 03/26/2020
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 03/26/2020
Rep. Levin, Mike [D-CA-49] 03/26/2020
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/26/2020
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 03/26/2020
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 03/26/2020
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 03/26/2020
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 03/26/2020
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 03/26/2020
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 03/26/2020
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 03/26/2020
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/26/2020
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 03/26/2020
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 03/26/2020
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 03/26/2020
Rep. Phillips, Dean [D-MN-3] 03/26/2020
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/26/2020
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 03/26/2020
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/26/2020
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/26/2020
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 03/26/2020
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 03/26/2020
Rep. Rouda, Harley [D-CA-48] 03/26/2020
Rep. Scanlon, Mary Gay [D-PA-5] 03/26/2020
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/26/2020
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 03/26/2020
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/26/2020
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 03/26/2020
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8] 03/26/2020
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 03/26/2020
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 03/26/2020
Rep. Stevens, Haley M. [D-MI-11] 03/26/2020
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 03/26/2020
Rep. Tlaib, Rashida [D-MI-13] 03/26/2020
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 03/26/2020
Rep. Trahan, Lori [D-MA-3] 03/26/2020
Rep. Trone, David J. [D-MD-6] 03/26/2020
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 03/26/2020
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 03/26/2020
Rep. Wexton, Jennifer [D-VA-10] 03/26/2020
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 03/31/2020
Rep. Shalala, Donna E. [D-FL-27] 03/31/2020
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-8] 04/07/2020
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 04/07/2020
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 04/22/2020
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/22/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services03/23/2020 Referred to

As of 05/30/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.Res.906 - Calling on the President to invoke the Defense Production Act to respond to COVID-19.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.906. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/23/2020)

This resolution calls on the President to (1) use all relevant authorities of the Defense Production Act to direct the domestic production of supplies to address COVID-19 (i.e., the coronavirus disease 2019), and (2) share specified information regarding the use of such authorities with Congress. (The Defense Production Act confers upon the President a broad set of authorities to influence domestic industry in order to provide essential materials and goods needed for the national defense.)

The resolution also states that Congress stands ready to make additional appropriations available for this effort.