Text: H.Res.908 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Engrossed in House (09/17/2020)

 
[Congressional Bills 116th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]
[H. Res. 908 Engrossed in House (EH)]

<DOC>
H. Res. 908

                In the House of Representatives, U. S.,

                                                    September 17, 2020.
Whereas 23 million Asian Americans and Pacific Islanders account for 7 percent 
        of the Nation's population in the United States;
Whereas over 2 million Asian Americans and Pacific Islanders are working on the 
        frontlines of this COVID-19 pandemic in health care, law enforcement, 
        first responders, transportation, supermarkets, and other service 
        industries;
Whereas the use of anti-Asian terminology and rhetoric related to COVID-19, such 
        as the ``Chinese Virus'', ``Wuhan Virus'', and ``Kung-flu'' have 
        perpetuated anti-Asian stigma;
Whereas since January 2020, there has been a dramatic increase in reports of 
        hate crimes and incidents against those of Asian descent;
Whereas according to a recent study, there were over 400 cases related to COVID-
        19 anti-Asian discrimination between February 9, 2020, and March 7, 
        2020;
Whereas the increased use of anti-Asian rhetoric has resulted in Asian Americans 
        being harassed, assaulted, and scapegoated for the COVID-19 pandemic;
Whereas in March 2020, anti-Asian violence includes: a woman wearing a mask was 
        kicked and punched at a New York City subway station; two children and 
        two adults were stabbed at a wholesale grocery in Midland, Texas; a 
        couple was assaulted and robbed by a group of attackers in Philadelphia; 
        and a 16-year-old boy was sent to the hospital after being attacked by 
        bullies in Los Angeles, California;
Whereas the increased use of anti-Asian rhetoric has also resulted in Asian-
        American businesses being targeted for vandalism;
Whereas there are approximately 2 million Asian American-owned businesses that 
        generate over $700 billion in annual revenue and employ nearly 4.5 
        million workers;
Whereas the World Health Organization (WHO) and the Centers for Disease Control 
        and Prevention (CDC) recognize that naming COVID-19 by its geographic 
        location or linking it to a specific ethnicity perpetuates stigma;
Whereas in 2015, the WHO issued guidance calling on media outlets, scientists, 
        and national authorities to avoid naming infectious diseases for 
        locations to avoid stigmatizing groups of people;
Whereas, on February 27, 2020, the Secretary of Health and Human Services stated 
        ``ethnicity is not what causes the novel coronavirus'' and that it is 
        inappropriate and inaccurate to call COVID-19 the ``Chinese virus'';
Whereas, on February 28, 2020, Dr. Mitch Wolfe, the Chief Medical Officer of the 
        CDC said, ``Stigma is the enemy of public health'';
Whereas, on March 10, 2020, Dr. Robert Redfield, the Director of the CDC, 
        testified that use of the term ``Chinese coronavirus'' is wrong and 
        inappropriate; and
Whereas the Secretary General of the United Nations called for international 
        solidarity and an end to any ill-founded discrimination of the 
        outbreak's victims: Now, therefore, be it
    Resolved, That the House of Representatives--
            (1) calls on all public officials to condemn and denounce any and 
        all anti-Asian sentiment in any form;
            (2) recognizes that the health and safety of all Americans, no 
        matter their background, must be of utmost priority;
            (3) condemns all manifestations of expressions of racism, 
        xenophobia, discrimination, anti-Asian sentiment, scapegoating, and 
        ethnic or religious intolerance;
            (4) calls on Federal law enforcement officials, working with State 
        and local officials--
                    (A) to expeditiously investigate and document all credible 
                reports of hate crimes and incidents and threats against the 
                Asian-American community in the United States;
                    (B) to collect data to document the rise of incidences of 
                hate crimes due to COVID-19; and
                    (C) to hold the perpetrators of those crimes, incidents, or 
                threats accountable and bring such perpetrators to justice; and
            (5) recommits United States leadership in building more inclusive, 
        diverse, and tolerant societies--
                    (A) to prioritize language access and inclusivity in 
                communication practices; and
                    (B) to combat misinformation and discrimination that put 
                Asian Americans at risk.
            Attest:

                                                                          Clerk.

Share This