There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Providing for consideration of the resolution (H. Res. 965) authorizing remote voting by proxy in the House of Representatives and providing for official remote committee proceedings during a public health emergency due to a novel coronavirus, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 6800) making emergency supplemental appropriations for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2020, and for other purposes; providing for proceedings during the period from May 19, 2020, through July 21, 2020; and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
05/15/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 207 - 199 (Roll No. 106).(text: CR H2007-2008)
05/14/2020The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 116-421, by Mr. McGovern.
05/14/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date All Actions
05/15/2020-12:31pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/15/2020-12:31pmOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 207 - 199 (Roll No. 106). (text: CR H2007-2008)
05/15/2020-11:23amOn ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 219 - 182 (Roll No. 105). (consideration: CR H2018)
05/15/2020-9:08amDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 967.
05/15/2020-9:03amConsidered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H2007-2019)
05/14/2020Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 79.
05/14/2020-9:27pmRule provides for one hour of debate on H. Res. 965 and two hours of debate on H.R. 6800.
05/14/2020The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 116-421, by Mr. McGovern.

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Rules05/14/2020 Reported original measure H. Rept. 116-421

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.967. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/14/2020)

Sets forth the rule for consideration of the resolution (H. Res. 965) authorizing remote voting by proxy in the House of Representatives and providing for official remote committee proceedings during a public health emergency due to a novel coronavirus, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 6800) making emergency supplemental appropriations for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2020, and for other purposes; providing for proceedings during the period from May 19, 2020, through July 21, 2020.