There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing support for a national day of mourning, a recurring moment of silence in the House of Representatives, and a national memorial for American civilians killed by COVID-19.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/22/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
05/22/2020Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/22/2020Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/22/2020Introduced in House

Cosponsors (50)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 05/22/2020
Rep. Wild, Susan [D-PA-7] 05/27/2020
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/27/2020
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 05/28/2020
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 06/01/2020
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/01/2020
Rep. Malinowski, Tom [D-NJ-7] 06/01/2020
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/01/2020
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/01/2020
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/01/2020
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-3] 06/01/2020
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 06/01/2020
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 06/01/2020
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/01/2020
Rep. Cox, TJ [D-CA-21] 06/01/2020
Rep. Underwood, Lauren [D-IL-14] 06/01/2020
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 06/01/2020
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 06/01/2020
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 06/01/2020
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 06/01/2020
Rep. Ocasio-Cortez, Alexandria [D-NY-14] 06/01/2020
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 06/01/2020
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/01/2020
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/01/2020
Rep. Spanberger, Abigail Davis [D-VA-7] 06/04/2020
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 06/04/2020
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 06/04/2020
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/04/2020
Rep. San Nicolas, Michael F. Q. [D-GU-At Large] 06/04/2020
Rep. Timmons, William R. IV [R-SC-4] 06/04/2020
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 06/04/2020
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 06/04/2020
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 06/04/2020
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 06/04/2020
Rep. Casten, Sean [D-IL-6] 06/04/2020
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/04/2020
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/04/2020
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 06/04/2020
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 06/04/2020
Rep. Lee, Susie [D-NV-3] 06/04/2020
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 06/04/2020
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/04/2020
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 06/04/2020
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 06/04/2020
Rep. Garcia, Sylvia R. [D-TX-29] 06/08/2020
Rep. Slotkin, Elissa [D-MI-8] 06/08/2020
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 06/18/2020
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/18/2020
Rep. Luria, Elaine G. [D-VA-2] 06/25/2020

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce05/22/2020 Referred to
House Rules05/22/2020 Referred to

As of 07/07/2020 no related bill information has been received for H.Res.975 - Expressing support for a national day of mourning, a recurring moment of silence in the House of Representatives, and a national memorial for American civilians killed by COVID-19.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.975. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/22/2020)

This resolution expresses support for a National Day of Mourning and other actions to honor the lives lost due to COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) once the pandemic has ended.