There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Title(s) as Introduced

PAST Act
Prevent All Soring Tactics Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Horse Protection Act to designate additional unlawful acts under the Act, strengthen penalties for violations of the Act, improve Department of Agriculture enforcement of the Act, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/03/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
04/03/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (51)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 04/03/2019
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 04/03/2019
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 04/03/2019
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA]* 04/03/2019
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 04/03/2019
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 04/03/2019
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 04/03/2019
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 04/03/2019
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT]* 04/03/2019
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA]* 04/03/2019
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 04/09/2019
Sen. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ] 04/29/2019
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 04/29/2019
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 04/29/2019
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA] 04/30/2019
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/30/2019
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 04/30/2019
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 05/06/2019
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 05/06/2019
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 05/06/2019
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 05/13/2019
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 05/13/2019
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 05/13/2019
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 05/14/2019
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 05/22/2019
Sen. McSally, Martha [R-AZ] 06/03/2019
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 06/03/2019
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 06/03/2019
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/04/2019
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 06/04/2019
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 06/05/2019
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 06/05/2019
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/05/2019
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 06/05/2019
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 06/05/2019
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/10/2019
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV] 06/10/2019
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 06/10/2019
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/19/2019
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 07/22/2019
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/29/2019
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 07/30/2019
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 09/09/2019
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/09/2019
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 09/09/2019
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 09/16/2019
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 10/29/2019
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 10/29/2019
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA] 10/31/2019
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 12/17/2019
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 12/18/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation04/03/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1007. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (04/03/2019)

Prevent All Soring Tactics Act of 2019 or the PAST Act

This bill addresses the practice of soring horses. The soring of horses includes various actions taken on horses' limbs to produce higher gaits that may cause pain, distress, inflammation, or lameness.

Specifically, the bill expands soring regulation and enforcement at horse shows, exhibitions, sales, and auctions, including by establishing a new system for inspecting horses for soring. In addition, the bill increases penalties for violations.