There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Route 66 Centennial Commission Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Route 66 Centennial Commission Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Route 66 Centennial Commission Act

Short Title(s) as Reported to Senate

Route 66 Centennial Commission Act

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Route 66 Centennial Commission Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to establish the Route 66 Centennial Commission, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
12/23/2020Became Public Law No: 116-256. (TXT | PDF)
12/23/2020Signed by President.
12/11/2020Presented to President.
12/08/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
08/10/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
07/23/2019By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 116-62.
06/19/2019Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso without amendment. Without written report.
04/03/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/23/2020Became Public Law No: 116-256. (TXT | PDF)
12/23/2020Signed by President.
12/11/2020SenatePresented to President.
12/08/2020-2:48pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/08/2020-2:47pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6984-6986)
12/08/2020-2:37pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1014.
12/08/2020-2:37pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6984-6987)
12/08/2020-2:37pmHouseMr. DeFazio moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
08/14/2020-2:26pmHouseHeld at the desk.
08/14/2020-2:03pmHouseReceived in the House.
08/11/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/10/2020SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S5382-5383)
08/10/2020SenateS.Amdt.2647 Amendment SA 2647 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
08/10/2020SenateS.Amdt.2647 Amendment SA 2647 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Duckworth. (consideration: CR S5382; text: CR S5381-5382) In the nature of a substitute.
08/10/2020SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S5382-5383)
07/23/2019SenateBy Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 116-62.
06/19/2019SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 117.
06/19/2019SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso without amendment. Without written report.
06/19/2019SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
04/03/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 04/03/2019
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 06/25/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Environment and Public Works04/03/2019 Referred to
06/19/2019 Markup by
06/19/2019 Reported by S. Rept. 116-62

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.1014. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-256 (12/23/2020)

Route 66 Centennial Commission Act

This bill establishes the Route 66 Centennial Commission to honor U.S. Route 66 on the occasion of its centennial anniversary.

The bill sets forth the duties of the commission, its membership, powers, and reporting requirements.

The commission shall terminate on December 31, 2026.