There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Revitalizing Underdeveloped Rural Areas and Lands (RURAL) Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to modify the definition of income for purposes of determining the tax-exempt status of certain corporations.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/04/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
04/04/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (56)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN]* 04/04/2019
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 04/30/2019
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 04/30/2019
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 05/02/2019
Sen. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ] 05/02/2019
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 05/13/2019
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND] 05/13/2019
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 05/13/2019
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/13/2019
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 05/13/2019
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 05/23/2019
Sen. McSally, Martha [R-AZ] 06/12/2019
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 06/18/2019
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 06/19/2019
Sen. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN] 06/19/2019
Sen. Scott, Rick [R-FL] 06/25/2019
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 06/28/2019
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 07/11/2019
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 09/11/2019
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 09/11/2019
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 09/11/2019
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 09/12/2019
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 09/19/2019
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 09/19/2019
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 09/24/2019
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 09/26/2019
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 09/26/2019
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 09/26/2019
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 10/16/2019
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 10/16/2019
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 10/16/2019
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 10/17/2019
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS] 10/21/2019
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 10/21/2019
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 10/24/2019
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 10/24/2019
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 10/24/2019
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 10/29/2019
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR] 10/29/2019
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 11/05/2019
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 11/05/2019
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 11/07/2019
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 11/07/2019
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 11/07/2019
Sen. Young, Todd [R-IN] 11/19/2019
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 11/19/2019
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 11/20/2019
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 11/20/2019
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 12/04/2019
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 12/05/2019
Sen. Hawley, Josh [R-MO] 12/09/2019
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK] 12/12/2019
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 12/12/2019
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 12/18/2019
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 12/18/2019
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 12/18/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Finance04/04/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1032. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (04/04/2019)

Revitalizing Underdeveloped Rural Areas and Lands (RURAL) Act

This bill modifies the definition of income used to determine the tax-exempt status of a mutual or cooperative telephone or electric company to exclude certain government grants, contributions, and assistance.

Specifically, the bill excludes from income (1) grants, contributions, and assistance provided under the Robert T. Stafford Disaster Relief and Emergency Assistance Act or by local, state, or regional governmental entities for disasters or emergencies; and (2) certain grants or contributions provided by a government entity for electric, communications, broadband, internet, or other utility facilities or services.