There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Access to Contraception for Servicemembers and Dependents Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 10, United States Code, to ensure that members of the Armed Forces and their families have access to the contraception they need in order to promote the health and readiness of all members of the Armed Forces, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/04/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
04/04/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (38)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 04/04/2019
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 04/04/2019
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 04/04/2019
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ]* 04/04/2019
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 04/04/2019
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 04/04/2019
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV]* 04/04/2019
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL]* 04/04/2019
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 04/04/2019
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 04/04/2019
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 04/04/2019
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 04/04/2019
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA]* 04/04/2019
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 04/04/2019
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 04/04/2019
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 04/04/2019
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 04/04/2019
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD]* 04/04/2019
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 04/04/2019
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 04/04/2019
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA]* 04/04/2019
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 04/04/2019
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 04/04/2019
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 04/04/2019
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA]* 04/04/2019
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 04/04/2019
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT]* 04/04/2019
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 04/04/2019
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI]* 04/04/2019
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV]* 04/04/2019
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 04/04/2019
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 04/04/2019
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 04/08/2019
Sen. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ] 04/29/2019
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 04/29/2019
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 05/13/2019
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 05/14/2019
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/05/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Armed Services04/04/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1049. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (04/04/2019)

Access to Contraception for Servicemembers and Dependents Act of 2019

This bill addresses the access of military personnel and dependents to contraception and family planning information.

The bill revises coverage of women's health services under the TRICARE program to (1) prohibit the imposition of cost-sharing for care related to the prevention of pregnancy, whether provided through a facility of the uniformed services, the TRICARE retail pharmacy program, or the national mail-order pharmacy program; and (2) include all methods of contraception approved by the Food and Drug Administration, contraceptive care, sterilization procedures, and patient education and counseling.

The Department of Defense (DOD) must furnish to sexual assault survivors at military medical facilities clear and comprehensible information about all methods of approved emergency contraception, notification of the survivor's right to confidentiality, and, upon request, emergency contraception or a prescription for emergency contraception.

DOD shall also establish a uniform standard curriculum for use in programs of family planning education during the first year of a member's service, when a member is in training to assume command, and when an enlisted member becomes a senior enlisted member.