There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Rare Earth Element Advanced Coal Technologies Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Rare Earth Element Advanced Coal Technologies Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to authorize the Office of Fossil Energy to develop advanced separation technologies for the extraction and recovery of rare earth elements and minerals from coal and coal byproducts, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
08/16/2019Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/01/2019 with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-74.
04/04/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date
08/16/2019Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 176.
Action By: Senate
08/16/2019Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/01/2019 with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-74.
07/16/2019Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
05/14/2019Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
04/04/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV]* 04/04/2019
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 04/04/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources04/04/2019 Referred to
05/14/2019 Hearings by
07/16/2019 Markup by
08/16/2019 Reported by S. Rept. 116-74

As of 11/17/2019 no related bill information has been received for S.1052 - Rare Earth Element Advanced Coal Technologies Act


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1052. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (04/04/2019)

Rare Earth Element Advanced Coal Technologies Act

This bill requires the Department of Energy's Office of Fossil Energy to create a program for the development of advanced separation technology to extract and recover rare earth elements and minerals from coal and coal byproducts.