There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Title(s) as Reported to Senate

Appalachian Energy for National Security Act

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Appalachian Energy for National Security Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require the Secretary of Energy to conduct a study on the national security implications of building ethane and other natural-gas-liquids-related petrochemical infrastructure in the United States, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
08/16/2019Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/01/2019 with an amendment. With written report No. 116-75.
04/08/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
08/16/2019Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 177.
Action By: Senate
08/16/2019Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/01/2019 with an amendment. With written report No. 116-75.
07/16/2019Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
07/09/2019Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy
04/08/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Energy and Natural Resources04/08/2019 Referred to
07/16/2019 Markup by
08/16/2019 Reported by S. Rept. 116-75
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy07/09/2019 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for S.1064.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1064. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate (08/16/2019)

Appalachian Energy for National Security Act

This bill directs the Department of Energy to conduct a study on the national security impacts of building ethane and other natural gas liquids petrochemical infrastructure in the vicinity of the Marcellus, Utica, and Rogersville shale plays located in the Appalachian region of the United States.

The study must include an examination of the proposed infrastructure, including an identification of the potential benefits to national and economic security and the risks posed by foreign ownership and control of U.S. domestic petrochemical resources.