There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Title(s) as Reported to Senate

Land and Water Conservation Fund Permanent Funding Act

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Land and Water Conservation Fund Permanent Funding Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 54, United States Code, to provide permanent, dedicated funding for the Land and Water Conservation Fund, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
02/25/2020Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with amendments. Without written report.
04/09/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
02/25/2020Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 429.
Action By: Senate
02/25/2020Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with amendments. Without written report.
11/19/2019Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
04/09/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (59)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO]* 04/09/2019
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 04/09/2019
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 04/09/2019
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 04/09/2019
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 04/09/2019
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 04/09/2019
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT]* 04/09/2019
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 04/09/2019
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 04/09/2019
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM]* 04/09/2019
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 04/09/2019
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME]* 04/09/2019
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 04/09/2019
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/11/2019
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/11/2019
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 04/11/2019
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 04/11/2019
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 04/29/2019
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 04/29/2019
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 04/29/2019
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 04/29/2019
Sen. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ] 04/29/2019
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/29/2019
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 04/29/2019
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA] 05/01/2019
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 05/01/2019
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 05/01/2019
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 05/01/2019
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 05/07/2019
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 05/07/2019
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV] 05/07/2019
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 05/07/2019
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 05/09/2019
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 05/09/2019
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 05/16/2019
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 05/22/2019
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 05/23/2019
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 05/23/2019
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/03/2019
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 06/03/2019
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/12/2019
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 06/19/2019
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 06/19/2019
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 06/25/2019
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 07/09/2019
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 07/10/2019
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/18/2019
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 07/30/2019
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 10/15/2019
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 12/11/2019
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 02/12/2020
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 02/12/2020
Sen. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN] 02/25/2020
Sen. McSally, Martha [R-AZ] 02/25/2020
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 02/27/2020
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 03/02/2020
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 03/03/2020
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 03/04/2020
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 03/04/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Energy and Natural Resources04/09/2019 Referred to
11/19/2019 Markup by
02/25/2020 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1081. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (04/09/2019)

Land and Water Conservation Fund Permanent Funding Act

This bill makes permanent, beginning in FY2020, funding for the Land and Water Conservation Fund (LWCF).

The President shall annually submit to Congress specified details regarding the allocation of funds to the LWCF. Congress may provide for alternate allocations using specified procedures.