There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

No Taxpayer Funding for Abortion and Abortion Insurance Full Disclosure Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to prohibit taxpayer funded abortions.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/10/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date
01/17/2019Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 48 - 47. Record Vote Number: 7. (CR S288)
Action By: Senate
01/17/2019Motion to proceed to measure considered in Senate. (CR S288)
Action By: Senate
01/16/2019Cloture motion on the motion to proceed presented in Senate. (CR S247-248)
Action By: Senate
01/16/2019Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S247)
Action By: Senate
01/11/2019Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 11.
Action By: Senate
01/10/2019Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (43)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 01/11/2019
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK] 01/11/2019
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 01/11/2019
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS] 01/11/2019
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 01/11/2019
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 01/11/2019
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 01/11/2019
Sen. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN] 01/11/2019
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 01/11/2019
Sen. Braun, Mike [R-IN] 01/11/2019
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 01/11/2019
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR] 01/11/2019
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 01/11/2019
Sen. Romney, Mitt [R-UT] 01/11/2019
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 01/11/2019
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 01/11/2019
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 01/11/2019
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA] 01/11/2019
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 01/11/2019
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 01/11/2019
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA] 01/11/2019
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 01/11/2019
Sen. Hawley, Josh [R-MO] 01/11/2019
Sen. Young, Todd C. [R-IN] 01/14/2019
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 01/14/2019
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 01/14/2019
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 01/14/2019
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 01/14/2019
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 01/14/2019
Sen. Sasse, Ben [R-NE] 01/14/2019
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 01/14/2019
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 01/14/2019
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 01/14/2019
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 01/14/2019
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 01/15/2019
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 01/15/2019
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 01/15/2019
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND] 01/15/2019
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 01/15/2019
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 01/17/2019
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 01/17/2019
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 01/17/2019
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 01/17/2019

Committees (0)

As of 10/18/2019 text has not been received for S.109 - No Taxpayer Funding for Abortion and Abortion Insurance Full Disclosure Act of 2019

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.109. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/10/2019)

No Taxpayer Funding for Abortion and Abortion Insurance Full Disclosure Act of 2019

This bill modifies provisions relating to federal funding for, and health insurance coverage of, abortions.

Specifically, the bill prohibits the use of federal funds for abortions or for health coverage that includes abortions. Such restrictions extend to the use of funds in the budget of the District of Columbia. Additionally, abortions may not be provided in a federal health care facility or by a federal employee.

Historically, language has been included in annual appropriations bills for the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) that prohibits the use of federal funds for abortions—such language is commonly referred to as the Hyde Amendment. Similar language is also frequently included in appropriations bills for other federal agencies and the District of Columbia. The bill makes these restrictions permanent and extends the restrictions to all federal funds (rather than specific agencies).

The bill's restrictions regarding the use of federal funds do not apply in cases of rape, incest, or where a physical disorder, injury, or illness endangers a woman's life unless an abortion is performed. The Hyde Amendment provides the same exceptions.

The bill also prohibits qualified health plans from including coverage for abortions. Currently, qualified health plans may cover abortion, but the portion of the premium attributable to abortion coverage is not eligible for subsidies.