Text: S.1094 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (04/09/2019)


116th CONGRESS
1st Session
S. 1094


To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to modify limitations on the credit for plug-in electric drive motor vehicles, and for other purposes.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

April 9, 2019

Ms. Stabenow (for herself, Mr. Alexander, Mr. Peters, and Ms. Collins) introduced the following bill; which was read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance


A BILL

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to modify limitations on the credit for plug-in electric drive motor vehicles, and for other purposes.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Driving America Forward Act”.

SEC. 2. Modification of limitations on new qualified plug-in electric drive motor vehicle credit.

(a) In general.—Subsection (e) of section 30D of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 is amended to read as follows:

“(e) Limitation on number of new qualified plug-In electric drive motor vehicles eligible for credit.—

“(1) IN GENERAL.—In the case of any new qualified plug-in electric drive motor vehicle sold after the date of the enactment of the Driving America Forward Act—

“(A) if such vehicle is sold during the transition period, the amount determined under subsection (b)(2) shall be reduced by $500, and

“(B) if such vehicle is sold during the phaseout period, only the applicable percentage of the credit otherwise allowable under subsection (a) shall be allowed.

“(2) TRANSITION PERIOD.—For purposes of this subsection, the transition period is the period subsequent to the first date on which the number of new qualified plug-in electric drive motor vehicles manufactured by the manufacturer of the vehicle referred to in paragraph (1) sold for use in the United States after December 31, 2009, is at least 200,000.

“(3) PHASEOUT PERIOD.—

“(A) IN GENERAL.—For purposes of this subsection, the phaseout period is the period beginning with the second calendar quarter following the calendar quarter which includes the first date on which the number of new qualified plug-in electric drive motor vehicles manufactured by the manufacturer of the vehicle referred to in paragraph (1) sold for use in the United States after December 31, 2009, is at least 600,000.

“(B) APPLICABLE PERCENTAGE.—For purposes of paragraph (1)(B), the applicable percentage is—

“(i) 50 percent for the first calendar quarter of the phaseout period, and

“(ii) 0 percent for each calendar quarter thereafter.

“(C) EXCLUSION OF SALE OF CERTAIN VEHICLES.—

“(i) IN GENERAL.—For purposes of subparagraph (A), any new qualified plug-in electric drive motor vehicle manufactured by the manufacturer of the vehicle referred to in paragraph (1) which was sold during the exclusion period shall not be included for purposes of determining the number of such vehicles sold.

“(ii) EXCLUSION PERIOD.—For purposes of this subparagraph, the exclusion period is the period—

“(I) beginning on the first date on which the number of new qualified plug-in electric drive motor vehicles manufactured by the manufacturer of the vehicle referred to in paragraph (1) sold for use in the United States after December 31, 2009, is at least 200,000, and

“(II) ending on the date of the enactment of the Driving America Forward Act.

“(4) CONTROLLED GROUPS.—Rules similar to the rules of section 30B(f)(4) shall apply for purposes of this subsection.”.

(b) Effective date.—The amendment made by this section shall apply to vehicles sold after the date of the enactment of this Act.

SEC. 3. Extension of credit for new qualified fuel cell motor vehicles.

(a) In general.—Section 30B(k)(1) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 is amended by striking “December 31, 2017” and inserting “December 31, 2028”.

(b) Effective date.—The amendments made by this section shall apply to property purchased after December 31, 2017.