There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Disability Integration Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to prohibit discrimination against individuals with disabilities who need long-term services and supports, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/15/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
01/15/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 01/23/2019
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 02/26/2019
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 04/29/2019
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 07/15/2019
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 07/29/2019
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 07/31/2019
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/31/2019
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 10/16/2019
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 10/29/2019
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 12/09/2019
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 12/17/2019
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 01/15/2020
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 03/10/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions01/15/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.117. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/15/2019)

Disability Integration Act of 2019

This bill prohibits government entities and insurance providers from denying community-based services to individuals with disabilities that require long-term service or support that would enable such individuals to live in the community and lead an independent life.

Specifically, these entities may not discriminate against such individuals in the provision of community-based services by such actions as imposing prohibited eligibility criteria, cost caps, or waiting lists or failing to provide a specific community-based service. Additionally, community-based services must be offered to individuals with such disabilities prior to institutionalization. Institutionalized individuals must be notified regularly of community-based alternatives.

The bill requires the Department of Justice and the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) to issue regulations requiring government entities and insurance providers to offer community-based long-term services to individuals with such disabilities who would otherwise qualify for institutional placement. Government entities must ensure sufficient availability of affordable, accessible, and integrated housing that is not a disability-specific residential setting or a setting where services are tied to tenancy.

Regulations shall also (1) require government entities and insurance providers to perform self-evaluation on current services, policies, and practices and concerning compliance with requirements of this bill; and (2) require government entities to submit a transition plan. HHS must determine annually whether each government entity is complying with the transition plan and must increase funding for those in compliance.

The bill allows civil actions by individuals subjected to, or about to be subjected to, a violation of its requirements.