There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Emergency Medical Services for Children Program Reauthorization Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Emergency Medical Services for Children Program Reauthorization Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Public Health Service Act to reauthorize the Emergency Medical Services for Children program.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
07/09/2019Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander without amendment. Without written report.
04/11/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
07/09/2019Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 137.
Action By: Senate
07/09/2019Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander without amendment. Without written report.
06/26/2019Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
04/11/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 04/11/2019
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS] 06/05/2019
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 06/19/2019
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 06/19/2019
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 06/19/2019
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 06/19/2019
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/16/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions04/11/2019 Referred to
06/26/2019 Markup by
07/09/2019 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1173. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate (07/09/2019)

Emergency Medical Services for Children Program Reauthorization Act of 2019

This bill reauthorizes through FY2024 the Emergency Medical Services for Children grant program. The program is administered by the Health Resources and Services Administration and focuses on improving emergency health care for children who are seriously ill or injured.