There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Blue Water Navy Vietnam Veterans Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to clarify presumption relating to the exposure of certain veterans who served in the vicinity of the Republic of Vietnam, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/11/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
04/11/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (57)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT]* 04/11/2019
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 04/11/2019
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV]* 04/11/2019
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 04/11/2019
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 04/11/2019
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND]* 04/11/2019
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 04/11/2019
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 04/11/2019
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL]* 04/11/2019
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 04/11/2019
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV]* 04/11/2019
Sen. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ]* 04/11/2019
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 04/11/2019
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 04/11/2019
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 04/11/2019
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 04/11/2019
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 04/11/2019
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 04/11/2019
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 04/11/2019
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD]* 04/11/2019
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 04/11/2019
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO]* 04/11/2019
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI]* 04/11/2019
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 04/11/2019
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 04/11/2019
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI]* 04/11/2019
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 04/11/2019
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN]* 04/11/2019
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 04/11/2019
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 04/11/2019
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 04/11/2019
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 04/30/2019
Sen. McSally, Martha [R-AZ] 04/30/2019
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/30/2019
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 04/30/2019
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 05/01/2019
Sen. Scott, Rick [R-FL] 05/01/2019
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 05/01/2019
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/02/2019
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 05/02/2019
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 05/02/2019
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 05/07/2019
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 05/08/2019
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 05/08/2019
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 05/15/2019
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 05/15/2019
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 05/15/2019
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 05/15/2019
Sen. Young, Todd [R-IN] 05/15/2019
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/15/2019
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA] 05/15/2019
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 05/21/2019
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/21/2019
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/21/2019
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 05/21/2019
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA] 06/03/2019
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 06/10/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Veterans' Affairs04/11/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1195. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (04/11/2019)

Blue Water Navy Vietnam Veterans Act of 2019

This bill extends the presumption of service-connection for certain diseases associated with herbicide (e.g., Agent Orange) exposure to veterans who served (1) offshore of Vietnam between January 9, 1962, and May 7, 1975, or (2) in or near the Korean Demilitarized Zone between September 1, 1967, and August 31, 1971. Under a presumption of service-connection, specific disabilities or diseases diagnosed in certain veterans are presumed to have been caused by the circumstances of their military service. Health care benefits and disability compensation may then be awarded.

The bill extends eligibility for health care, vocational training and rehabilitation, and monetary allowance to children with spina bifida who have at least one veteran parent who may have been exposed to an herbicide agent while serving in Thailand between January 9, 1962, and May 7, 1975.

The Department of Veterans Affairs must report on the Follow-up Study of a National Cohort of Gulf War and Gulf War Era Veterans.