There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Protecting America's First Responders Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Protecting America's First Responders Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Protecting America's First Responders Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 with respect to payments to certain public safety officers who have become permanently and totally disabled as a result of personal injuries sustained in the line of duty, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
05/16/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S2893-2895; text: CR 5/20/2019 S2981-2982)
05/13/2019Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Graham with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
04/11/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber All Actions
05/31/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/16/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
05/16/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/16/2019-3:00pmHouseReceived in the House.
05/16/2019SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2893-2895; text: CR 5/20/2019 S2981-2982)
05/13/2019SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 83.
05/13/2019SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Graham with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
05/09/2019SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
04/11/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Cosponsors (15)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary04/11/2019 Referred to
05/09/2019 Markup by
05/13/2019 Reported by
House Judiciary05/16/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security05/31/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.